Beltex Corporation v. Robert Heath Trucking, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Beltex Corporation
3Rd Party Plaintiff: Robert Heath Logistics, Inc. and Robert Heath Trucking, Inc.
3Rd Party Defendant: Legal Freightlines, LLC
Case Number: 4:2019cv00133
Filed: February 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Terry R Means
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Commerce
Cause of Action: 49:81
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 10, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION Substituted Service filed by Beltex Corporation with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Song, Tailim)
April 9, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Robert Heath Logistics, Inc., Robert Heath Trucking, Inc. with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Henry, Vic)
March 25, 2019 Filing 13 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Legal Freightlines, LLC. (bdb)
March 25, 2019 Filing 12 Request for Clerk to issue Default Judgment filed by Robert Heath Trucking, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit(s), #2 Proposed Order) (Henry, Vic)
March 1, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Legal Freightlines, LLC ; served on 2/26/2019. (Henry, Vic)
February 26, 2019 Filing 10 Third-Party Summons Reissued as to Legal Freightlines, LLC. (bdb)
February 26, 2019 Filing 9 ***DISREGARD - SEE DOC 10 FOR SUMMONS*** Summons Issued as to Legal Freightlines, LLC. (mpw) Modified on 2/26/2019 (bdb).
February 25, 2019 Filing 8 THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Legal Freightlines, LLC filed by Robert Heath Trucking, Inc.. Clerk to issue third-party summons(es). Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Henry, Vic)
February 22, 2019 Filing 7 Third Party Summons Issued as to Legal Freightlines, LLC. (mpw)
February 22, 2019 Filing 6 THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Legal Freightlines, LLC filed by Robert Heath Logistics, Inc.. Clerk to issue third-party summons(es). Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Henry, Vic)
February 21, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint filed by Robert Heath Logistics, Inc.. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Henry, Vic)
February 20, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint filed by Robert Heath Trucking, Inc.. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Henry, Vic)
February 13, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:3. Wed Feb 13 15:44:17 CST 2019 (crt)
February 13, 2019 Filing 3 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. File to: Judge Means. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (mpw)
February 13, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Robert Heath Logistics, Inc., Robert Heath Trucking, Inc.. (Henry, Vic)
February 13, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 236th Judicial District Court of Tarrant County, case number 236-304923-18 filed by Robert Heath Logistics, Inc., Robert Heath Trucking, Inc.. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0539-9778335) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1, #2 Exhibit(s) 2, #3 Exhibit(s) 2A, #4 Exhibit(s) 2B, #5 Exhibit(s) 2C, #6 Exhibit(s) 2D, #7 Cover Sheet, #8 Cover Sheet Supplement) (Henry, Vic)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Beltex Corporation v. Robert Heath Trucking, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Robert Heath Logistics, Inc.
Represented By: Vic H Henry
Represented By: Emileigh Stewart Hubbard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Robert Heath Trucking, Inc.
Represented By: Vic H Henry
Represented By: Emileigh Stewart Hubbard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beltex Corporation
Represented By: Tailim Song
Represented By: Jordan Timothy Whiddon
Represented By: Haben I Tewelde
Represented By: Jennifer C. Ohn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Legal Freightlines, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?