Allied Pilots Association v Criddle

Plaintiff: Allied Pilots Association
Defendant: George Criddle
Case Number: 4:2019cv00173
Filed: February 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Reed C O'Connor
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other Labor Litigation
Cause of Action: 05:704
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 FINAL JUDGMENT: It is ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that this case is REMANDED to the 17th Judicial District Court of Tarrant County, Texas, cause number 017-305778-19. The clerk shall transmit a true copy of this Judgment, together with a true copy of the Order granting remand to the parties. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 3/5/2019) (skg)
March 5, 2019 Civil Case Terminated per Final Judgment #19 . Case remanded to 17th Judicial District, Tarrant County. Remand letter, copy of order #18 , final judgment #19 and docket sheet mailed to: 17th Judicial District, Tarrant County 3rd Floor 100 North Calhoun Street Fort Worth, TX, 76196. (skg) Modified on 3/5/2019 (skg).
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #7 Motion to Remand to State Court. Accordingly, the APA's Motion to Remand, (ECF No. 7), is GRANTED in accordance with the mandate of 28 U.S.C. 1447(c). (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 3/5/2019) (chmb)
March 1, 2019 Filing 17 REPLY filed by Allied Pilots Association re: #7 Motion to Remand (Winnubst, Mark)
February 28, 2019 Filing 16 Appendix in Support filed by George Criddle re #15 Response/Objection to Plaintiff's Motion for Remand (Hallmon, Laura)
February 28, 2019 Filing 15 RESPONSE filed by George Criddle re: #7 MOTION to Remand to State Court (Hallmon, Laura)
February 27, 2019 Filing 14 Appendix in Support filed by Allied Pilots Association re #13 Reply (Winnubst, Mark)
February 27, 2019 Filing 13 REPLY filed by Allied Pilots Association re: #8 Emergency Motion to Extend Temporary Restraining Order (Winnubst, Mark)
February 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: Defendant is DIRECTED to file a response to the motion to remand on or before February 28, 2019; Plaintiff may file a reply on or before March 1, 2019. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 2/27/2019) (chmb)
February 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ELECTRONIC ORDER deferring ruling on #8 Motion for TRO and requiring a response by 2pm February 27, 2019, (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 2/27/2019) (Judge Reed C. O'Connor)
February 27, 2019 Filing 10 Appendix in Support filed by George Criddle re #9 Response/Objection to Emergency Motion to Extend Temporary Restraining Order (Hancock, Katherine)
February 27, 2019 Filing 9 RESPONSE filed by George Criddle re: #8 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Seeking Extension of Existing State District Court TRO (Hancock, Katherine)
February 26, 2019 Filing 8 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Seeking Extension of Existing State District Court TRO filed by Allied Pilots Association with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Andrews, Latrice)
February 26, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Allied Pilots Association with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Andrews, Latrice)
February 26, 2019 Filing 6 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. File to: Judge O Connor. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (mpw)
February 26, 2019 Filing 5 AMENDED NOTICE OF REMOVAL by George Criddle. (Hancock, Katherine)
February 26, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by George Criddle. (Hallmon, Laura)
February 26, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by George Criddle (Hallmon, Laura) Modified on 2/26/2019 (mpw).
February 26, 2019 Filing 2 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet by George Criddle as to #1 Notice of Removal. (Hallmon, Laura)
February 26, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Civil Cover Sheet only, see #3 for Removal paperwork) from 17th Judicial District, Tarrant County, case number 017-305778-19 filed by George Criddle. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0539-9806919) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Hallmon, Laura) Modified on 2/26/2019 (mpw).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Allied Pilots Association v Criddle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George Criddle
Represented By: Katherine R Hancock
Represented By: Laura Hallmon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allied Pilots Association
Represented By: Latrice Elder Andrews
Represented By: Mark D Winnubst
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?