Burch et al v. Unknown

Undetermined: Mark X Mullin and Case Admin Sup
Appellee: Unknown
Appellant: William Paul Burch
Case Number: 4:2019cv00192
Filed: March 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: John McBryde
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy: Appeal 28 USC 158
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 29, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:9. cy to Burch Mon Apr 29 15:21:26 CDT 2019 (crt)
April 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 FINAL JUDGMENT...the order of the US Bankruptcy Court denying motion for recusal from which appeal is taken is affirmed. (Ordered by Senior Judge John McBryde on 4/29/2019) (wrb)
April 29, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:8. cy to Burch Mon Apr 29 15:14:44 CDT 2019 (crt)
April 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: the order from which appeal is taken is AFFIRMED. (Ordered by Senior Judge John McBryde on 4/29/2019) (wrb)
April 26, 2019 Filing 7 Appeal Brief filed by William Paul Burch per #6 Order (wrb)
April 26, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:6. cy to Burch, appeals Fri Apr 26 14:36:13 CDT 2019 (crt)
April 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Motion to Extend Time. Appellants motion granted and clerk directed to file the brief that has been lodged with the court. cy to appeals (Ordered by Senior Judge John McBryde on 4/26/2019) (wrb)
April 25, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION For Additional Time filed by William Paul Burch (wrb)
April 3, 2019 Filing 4 Notice of transmission of bankruptcy record on appeal for < number 18-4176. Pursuant to < 8010, the bankruptcy clerk has transmitted the record on appeal to the U.S. District Court. See Fed. R. Bankr. P. 8018 for information on briefing times. (Attachments: #1 Mini Record, #2 Volume 2) (Rueter - BK, Karyn)
March 5, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:2,3. cy to Burch Tue Mar 5 16:39:32 CST 2019 (crt)
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Standing ORDER Concerning Paper Filing in Cases Assigned to District Judge John McBryde...see order for specifics. (Ordered by Senior Judge John McBryde on 3/5/2019) (wrb)
March 5, 2019 Filing 2 Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party (wrb)
March 5, 2019 New Case Notes: A filing fee is due in BK court. No prior sanctions found. (For court use only - links to the #national and #circuit indexes.) File to Judge McBryde. (wrb)
March 5, 2019 Filing 1 Pursuant to Fed. R. Bankr. P. 8003(d), the bankruptcy clerk has transmitted the notice of appeal filed in #bankruptcy case number 18-04176-mxm and the notice of appeal has now been docketed in the district court in case 4:19-cv-192. (The filing fee is due to the Bankruptcy Court.) Pursuant to #Fed. R. Bankr. P. 8009, before the record on appeal can be assembled and filed in the district court, designations of items to be included in the record on appeal and statements of issues must be filed in the bankruptcy case. If a sealed document is designated, the designating party must file a motion in the district court case for the document to be accepted under seal. See also #District Court Local Bankruptcy Rule 8012.1. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: #Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Appeal, Order Appealed, Motion to Waive Filing Fee, Notice of Hearing) (Levario - BK, Tandi)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Burch et al v. Unknown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: Mark X Mullin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: Case Admin Sup
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Unknown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: William Paul Burch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?