Green v. Espraza
Plaintiff: Vincent Green
Defendant: Officer Espraza
Case Number: 4:2019cv00297
Filed: April 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: John McBryde
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Pet/Other: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 10, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:5. Wed Apr 10 08:19:39 CDT 2019 (crt)
April 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order and Notice of Deficiency: Vincent Green must address the following deficiency: Plaintiff has not paid the applicable fees or sought to proceed in forma pauperis; has not presented his suit on the completed form as required by the miscellaneous orders of this Court. Failure to comply with this order may lead to dismissal for failure to prosecute pursuant to FRCvP 41(b). Deadline to cure the deficiency is 30 days. (Ordered by Senior Judge John McBryde on 4/9/2019) (tln)
April 9, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:2,3,4. Tue Apr 9 12:57:20 CDT 2019 (crt)
April 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Standing ORDER Concerning Paper Filing in Cases Assigned to District Judge John McBryde...see order for specifics. (Ordered by Senior Judge John McBryde on 4/3/2019) (npk)
April 3, 2019 Filing 3 Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party (npk)
April 3, 2019 Filing 2 New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. No prior sanctions found. (For court use only - links to the #national and #circuit indexes.) File to staff attorney DK. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (npk)
April 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Officer Espraza filed by Vincent Green. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (npk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Green v. Espraza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vincent Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Espraza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?