Martin v. Walmart Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Bonita Martin
Defendant: Marcos Sosa, Walmart Inc., Gary Smith and Walmart Inc
Case Number: 4:2019cv00336
Filed: April 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Terry R Means
Nature of Suit: Torts/Pers Inj: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 19, 2019 Filing 17 REPLY filed by Gary Smith, Marcos Sosa, Walmart Inc re: #14 MOTION for Leave to File Answer to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s)) (Rhine, Bevan)
July 5, 2019 Filing 16 Appendix in Support filed by Bonita Martin re #15 Response/Objection (Fillmore, Charles)
July 5, 2019 Filing 15 RESPONSE filed by Bonita Martin re: #14 MOTION for Leave to File Answer to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint (Fillmore, Charles)
June 14, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for Leave to File Answer to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint filed by Gary Smith, Marcos Sosa, Walmart Inc (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Proposed Order) (Martinez, Ramona)
June 12, 2019 Filing 13 REPLY filed by Bonita Martin re: #9 MOTION to Remand (Fillmore, Charles)
June 10, 2019 Filing 12 RESPONSE filed by Gary Smith, Marcos Sosa, Walmart Inc re: #9 MOTION to Remand (Martinez, Ramona)
May 20, 2019 Filing 11 ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to #8 Amended Complaint,, by Plaintiff Bonita Martin. (Fillmore, Charles)
May 20, 2019 Filing 10 Appendix in Support filed by Bonita Martin re #9 MOTION to Remand (Fillmore, Charles)
May 20, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Remand filed by Bonita Martin with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Fillmore, Charles)
May 20, 2019 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against All Defendants filed by Bonita Martin. Summons(es) not requested at this time. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Fillmore, Charles)
April 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: Plaintiff's amended complaint must be electronically filed with the clerk of the Court no later than May 27, 2019. Failure to timely comply with this order will result in appropriate sanctions, including the dismissal of Plaintiff's claims. (Ordered by Senior Judge Terry R Means on 4/25/2019) (npk)
April 24, 2019 Filing 6 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. File to: Judge Means. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (npk)
April 24, 2019 Filing 5 Court Request for Recusal: Senior Judge John McBryde recused. Pursuant to instruction in Special Order 3-249, the Clerk has reassigned the case to Senior Judge Terry R Means for all further proceedings. Future filings should indicate the case number as: 4:19-cv-336-Y. (bcr)
April 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Standing ORDER Concerning Paper Filing in Cases Assigned to District Judge John McBryde...see order for specifics. (Ordered by Senior Judge John McBryde on 4/24/2019) (npk)
April 24, 2019 Filing 3 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. File to Judge McBryde. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (npk)
April 24, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Gary Smith, Marcos Sosa, Walmart Inc.. (Martinez, Ramona)
April 24, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 67th District Court, Tarrant County, case number 067-306701-19 filed by Marcos Sosa, Gary Smith, Walmart Inc.. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0539-9939706) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A index, #2 Exhibit(s) B state docket, #3 Exhibit(s) C state pldgs, #4 Exhibit(s) D discl stmt, #5 Cover Sheet, #6 Cover Sheet Supplement) (Martinez, Ramona)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Martin v. Walmart Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marcos Sosa
Represented By: Ramona Martinez
Represented By: Bevan A Rhine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart Inc.
Represented By: Ramona Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Smith
Represented By: Ramona Martinez
Represented By: Bevan A Rhine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart Inc
Represented By: Ramona Martinez
Represented By: Bevan A Rhine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bonita Martin
Represented By: Kerry H Collins
Represented By: H Dustin Fillmore, III
Represented By: Charles W Fillmore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?