RFC Drilling, LLC v. Cheyenne Petroleum Company

Plaintiff: RFC Drilling, LLC
Defendant: Cheyenne Petroleum Company
Case Number: 4:2019cv00366
Filed: May 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Reed C O'Connor
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 2, 2019 Filing 6 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. File to: Judge O Connor. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (npk)
May 2, 2019 Filing 5 Case electronically transferred in from District of Texas Southern; Case Number 5:19-cv-00049. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas should seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Copy of NEF to be sent US Mail to parties not electronically noticed.
April 29, 2019 Interdistrict transfer to Northern District of Texas, Fort Worth Division. Case transferred electronically, filed. (mmarquez, 5) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 5/2/2019.]
April 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Granting #2 Unopposed MOTION to Transfer Case to Northern District of Texas, Fort Worth Division. IT IS SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Diana Saldana) Parties notified.(mmarquez, 5) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 5/2/2019.]
April 17, 2019 Filing 3 First AMENDED ANSWER to with Jury Demand by Cheyenne Petroleum Company, filed. (Giddens, Jared) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 5/2/2019.]
April 15, 2019 Filing 2 Unopposed MOTION to Transfer Case to Northern District of Texas, Fort Worth Division by Cheyenne Petroleum Company, filed. Motion Docket Date 5/6/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to Unopposed Motion to Transfer Venue, #2 Proposed Order Granting Unopposed Motion to Transfer Venue)(Giddens, Jared) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 5/2/2019.]
April 9, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from District Court for LaSalle County, Texas, case number 19-02-000219-CVL (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-22204347) filed by Cheyenne Petroleum Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Index of Pleadings Filed in State Court, #2 Exhibit State Court Docket Sheet, #3 Exhibit Plaintiff's Original Petition, #4 Exhibit Citation Served on Defendant, #5 Exhibit Defendant's Motion to Transfer Venue, #6 Exhibit Special Appearance and Original Answer, #7 Exhibit Plaintiff's Motion to Transfer Venue, #8 Exhibit List of All Counsel of Record, #9 Civil Cover Sheet)(Giddens, Jared) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 5/2/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: RFC Drilling, LLC v. Cheyenne Petroleum Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RFC Drilling, LLC
Represented By: John Hunter Parrish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cheyenne Petroleum Company
Represented By: Jared D Giddens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?