Coffey v. Berryhill
Plaintiff: Jacqueline Coffey
Defendant: Nancy Berryhill
Interested Party: Social Security Administration - Interested Party
Case Number: 4:2019cv00390
Filed: May 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Terry R Means
Referring Judge: Hal R Ray
Nature of Suit: Social Security: RSI (405(g))
Cause of Action: 42:416
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 4, 2019 Filing 9 USMS Process Receipt and Return re SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Nancy Berryhill; served on 5/30/2019 (by serving the Attorney General of the United States.) (tln)
May 24, 2019 Filing 8 USMS Process Receipt and Return re SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Nancy Berryhill; served on 5/24/2019 (by serving the United States Attorney.) (tln)
May 13, 2019 Filing 7 Summons issued as to Nancy Berryhill, U.S. Attorney, and U.S. Attorney General. ***Emailed to USM for service on 5/13/2019. (skg)
May 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Hal R. Ray, Jr on 5/13/2019) (skg)
May 10, 2019 Filing 5 New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. CASREF case referral set (see Special Order 3). Magistrate Judge Ray preliminarily assigned. File to: Judge Ray. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. Motion(s) referred to Magistrate Judge Hal R. Ray, Jr. (tln)
May 10, 2019 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to issue Summons filed by Jacqueline Coffey. (Scoggin, Steven)
May 10, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Jacqueline Coffey. (Scoggin, Steven)
May 10, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Jacqueline Coffey with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Scoggin, Steven)
May 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Jacqueline Coffey filed by Jacqueline Coffey. (Filer fee note- IFP motion in complaint or to be filed) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (Scoggin, Steven)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Coffey v. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Social Security Administration - Interested Party
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacqueline Coffey
Represented By: Steven R Scoggin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?