Echevarria v. Mercantile Adjustment Bureau LLC et al
Plaintiff: Salomon Echevarria
Defendant: Mercantile Adjustment Bureau LLC, Bank of America, N.A. and Bank of America NA
Case Number: 4:2019cv00419
Filed: May 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: John McBryde
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 18, 2019 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Bank of America NA. (tln)
July 18, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Lishel May Bautista on behalf of Bank of America NA. (tln)
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 Second Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to #1 Complaint. IT IS ORDERED that Defendant, Mercantile Adjustment Bureau, LLC, shall have until August 5, 2019 to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. (Ordered by Senior Judge John McBryde on 7/16/2019) (tln)
July 16, 2019 Filing 14 SECOND UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT filed by Mercantile Adjustment Bureau LLC. (tln)
July 5, 2019 Filing 13 Duplicate notice of service of summons on Bank of America NA filed by Salomon Echevarria. (bdb)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #10 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to #1 Complaint. IT IS ORDERED that Defendant, Mercantile Adjustment Bureau, LLC, shall have until July 22, 2019 to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. (Ordered by Senior Judge John McBryde on 7/3/2019) (tln)
July 3, 2019 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Mercantile Adjustment Bureau LLC. (tln)
July 3, 2019 Filing 10 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint filed by Mercantile Adjustment Bureau LLC. (tln)
July 1, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Bank of America NA; served on 6/27/2019. (tln)
June 28, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Mercantile Adjustment Bureau LLC; served on 6/18/2019. (tln)
June 17, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Salomon Echevarria. (tln)
May 28, 2019 Filing 6 Received originals and judge's copies pursuant to Standing Order re: #1 Complaint,,,, #2 Cert. Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement filed by Salomon Echevarria (Attachments: #1 Additional Page(s)) (wrb)
May 22, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Bank of America, N.A., Mercantile Adjustment Bureau LLC. (tln)
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Standing ORDER Concerning Paper Filing in Cases Assigned to District Judge John McBryde...see order for specifics. (Ordered by Senior Judge John McBryde on 5/22/2019) (tln)
May 22, 2019 Filing 3 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. File to Judge McBryde. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (tln)
May 21, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Salomon Echevarria. (Jaffer, Shawn)
May 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against All Defendants filed by Salomon Echevarria. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-10002052) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (Jaffer, Shawn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Echevarria v. Mercantile Adjustment Bureau LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Salomon Echevarria
Represented By: Shawn Jaffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mercantile Adjustment Bureau LLC
Represented By: Whitney L White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America NA
Represented By: Lishel May Bautista
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?