Reed et al v. State Farm Lloyds Insurance Company

Plaintiff: Sue Reed and Greg Reed
Defendant: State Farm Lloyds Insurance Company and State Farm Lloyds
Case Number: 4:2019cv00420
Filed: May 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: John McBryde
Nature of Suit: Contract: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STATUS REPORT ORDER: Joint Status Report due by 8/19/2019. (Ordered by Senior Judge John McBryde on 7/18/2019) (bdb)
July 17, 2019 Filing 9 FIRST AMENDED ANSWER to #8 First Amended Complaint, filed by State Farm Lloyds. (tln)
July 1, 2019 Filing 8 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against State Farm Lloyds filed by Greg Reed, Sue Reed. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (tln)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER FOR REPLEADING: Amended Pleadings due by 7/8/2019. Responses due by 7/22/2019. (Ordered by Senior Judge John McBryde on 6/21/2019) (bdb)
June 21, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Amend Complaint filed by Greg Reed, Sue Reed. (bdb)
June 3, 2019 Filing 5 Judge McBryde's paper original and copy of #1 Notice of Removal, Cert. Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement, filed by State Farm Lloyds Insurance Company. (tln)
May 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: On May 22, 2019, defendant electronically filed in thisaction its notice of removal (doc.' 1). Pursuant to the court'sStanding Order (doc. #3 ) docketed in this action May 23, 2019, defendant was to deliver to the clerk of court within threebusiness days of receipt of that order the original and one copyof its notice of removal in paper form, without any changesexcept as necessary to comply with the requirements of paragraph1 of that order and bearing original signatures as if thedocuments had been filed in paper form. To date, defendant has not filed those documents in compliance with that order. Therefore, the court ORDERS that by 4:00p.m. on June 5, 2019, defendant file the above-referenced documents, as required by the Standing Order. Failure to do so may result in the remand of this action to the state court from which it was removed without further notice. (Ordered by Senior Judge John McBryde on 5/31/2019) (tln)
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Standing ORDER Concerning Paper Filing in Cases Assigned to District Judge John McBryde...see order for specifics. (Ordered by Senior Judge John McBryde on 5/23/2019) (tln)
May 23, 2019 Filing 2 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. File to Judge McBryde. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (tln)
May 22, 2019 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by State Farm Lloyds Insurance Company. (see doc. #1 for image) (tln)
May 22, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH JURY DEMAND from 348th Judicial District Court, Tarrant County, case number 348-307463-19 filed by State Farm Lloyds Insurance Company. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0539-10004182) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Cover Sheet Supplement, #3 Exhibit(s) A, #4 Exhibit(s) B) (Kessler, M)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reed et al v. State Farm Lloyds Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Lloyds Insurance Company
Represented By: M Micah Kessler
Represented By: Avniel J Adler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Lloyds
Represented By: Avniel J Adler
Represented By: M Micah Kessler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sue Reed
Represented By: Thomas Wayne Hamrick
Represented By: Mark T Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Greg Reed
Represented By: Thomas Wayne Hamrick
Represented By: Mark T Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?