The Bank Of New York Mellon Trust Company, National Association v. Holcomb
Plaintiff: The Bank Of New York Mellon Trust Company, National Association
Defendant: Sherry Lynn Holcomb
Case Number: 4:2019cv00432
Filed: May 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: John McBryde
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 FINAL JUDGMENT...Deft in default on her obligations under the Texas Home Equity Note signed Sep 8 2005 and the Texas Equity Security Instrument signed Sept 8 2005. (Ordered by Senior Judge John McBryde on 7/23/2019) (wrb)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 Memorandum Opinion and Order...Motion for default judgment granted. Deft in default on her obligations on the note and security instrument; Pltf have and recover its costs of court from deft; pltf authorized to file motion for atty fees; The following are secured by the security instrument; a) the outstanding balance of the note b) prejudgment interest at note's interest rate of 9/150 percent; c) post judgment interest at rate of 9.150 percent from date of judgment until paid and d) costs of court. Pltf authorized to enforce the power of sale in the security instrument thru foreclosure of the property. (Ordered by Senior Judge John McBryde on 7/23/2019) (wrb)
July 16, 2019 Filing 22 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Sherry Lynn Holcomb (wrb)
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #20 Request for Default Judgment. (Ordered by Senior Judge John McBryde on 7/16/2019)
July 15, 2019 Filing 18 Plaintiff's Facts Establishing Subject Matter Jurisdiction filed by The Bank Of New York Mellon Trust Company, National Association. (wrb)
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER: by 4pm July 18 2019, plaintiff file a document that alleges facts establishing subject matter jurisdiction. Plaintiff failed to allege complete diversity of citizenship; specifically, plaintiff failed to allege the state of which defendant is a citizen, and nothing in the record suggests her state of citizenship. (Ordered by Senior Judge John McBryde on 7/11/2019) (wrb)
July 10, 2019 Filing 20 Exhibits to #16 Request for Clerk's Entry of Default Table of Contents filed by The Bank Of New York Mellon Trust Company, National Association. (wrb)
July 10, 2019 Filing 19 Exhibits to #15 Motion for Default Judgment Table of Contents filed by The Bank Of New York Mellon Trust Company, National Association. (wrb)
July 10, 2019 Filing 16 Request for Clerk to issue clerk's entry of default filed by The Bank Of New York Mellon Trust Company, National Association. (wrb) (Main Document 16 replaced on 7/16/2019) (wrb).
July 10, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for Default Judgment against Sherry Lynn Holcomb filed by The Bank Of New York Mellon Trust Company, National Association (wrb) (Main Document 15 replaced on 7/16/2019) (wrb).
June 24, 2019 Filing 14 Return of Service Executed on 6/11/19 as to Sherry Lynn Holcomb re: #6 Summons Issued. (wrb)
June 13, 2019 Filing 23 EXHIBITS TO ORIGINAL COMPLAINT to #13 Initiating Case Opening Documents pursuant to Standing Order by Plaintiff The Bank Of New York Mellon Trust Company, National Association. (wrb)
June 13, 2019 Filing 13 Received original and Judge's copy pursuant to Standing Order re: #1 Complaint filed by The Bank Of New York Mellon Trust Company, National Association (Attachments: #1 Exhibits) (wrb)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Order Unfiling #11 Notice (Other) filed by The Bank Of New York Mellon Trust Company, National Association due to the following deficiency: docs still fail to comply; pltf stapled collection of exhibits, rather than binding separately from complaint and filing as separate vol.. re: #11 Notice (Other) (Ordered by Senior Judge John McBryde on 6/11/2019) (wrb)
June 10, 2019 Filing 11 [UNFILED PER ORDER OF JUN 11 2019] Received Original and Copy of Initiating Complaint pursuant to Standing Order re: #1 Complaint,,,, filed by The Bank Of New York Mellon Trust Company, National Association (wrb) Modified on 6/12/2019 (wrb).
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Order Unfiling #9 Notice (copy of complaint only), filed by The Bank Of New York Mellon Trust Company, National Association due to the following deficiency: The exhibits were not filed in a separate volume and did not bear consecutive page numbers and a table of contents, nor were items of particular pertinence highlighted. (see order for specifics) (Ordered by Senior Judge John McBryde on 6/6/2019) (tln)
June 6, 2019 Filing 9 ***UNFILED PER #10 ORDER***Received Original and Copy of Case Initiating Documents pursuant to Standing Order re: #2 Cert. Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement, #1 Complaint, filed by The Bank Of New York Mellon Trust Company, National Association (Attachments: #1 Additional Page(s)) (wrb) Modified text on 6/7/2019 (tln).
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order Unfiling #7 Notice (Other), filed by The Bank Of New York Mellon Trust Company, National Association due to the following deficiency: exhibits not filed in separate vol and do not bear consecutive case numbers, index tabs, and a table of contents, nor are items of particular pertinence highlighted.. re: #7 Notice (Other), (Ordered by Senior Judge John McBryde on 6/4/2019) (wrb)
May 31, 2019 Filing 7 [unfiled per order of Jun 4 2019]Received originals of case initiating documents pursuant to Standing Order re: #2 Cert. Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement, #1 Complaint,,,, filed by The Bank Of New York Mellon Trust Company, National Association (Attachments: #1 Additional Page(s)) (wrb) Modified on 6/4/2019 (wrb).
May 29, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Sherry Lynn Holcomb. (wrb)
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Standing ORDER Concerning Paper Filing in Cases Assigned to District Judge John McBryde...see order for specifics. (Ordered by Senior Judge John McBryde on 5/29/2019) (wrb)
May 29, 2019 Filing 4 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. File to Judge McBryde. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (wrb)
May 28, 2019 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to issue Summons as to Sherry Lynn Holcomb filed by The Bank Of New York Mellon Trust Company, National Association. (Cronenwett, Mark)
May 28, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by The Bank Of New York Mellon Trust Company, National Association. (Cronenwett, Mark)
May 28, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Sherry Lynn Holcomb filed by The Bank Of New York Mellon Trust Company, National Association. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-10013662) Plaintiff will submit summons(es) for issuance. In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Cover Sheet) (Cronenwett, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Bank Of New York Mellon Trust Company, National Association v. Holcomb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Bank Of New York Mellon Trust Company, National Association
Represented By: Mark D Cronenwett
Represented By: Jonathan C Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sherry Lynn Holcomb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?