Slater v. Jefferson et al
Plaintiff: Angela Slater
Defendant: Bloomin' Brands, Inc. and Joshua Jefferson
Case Number: 4:2019cv00469
Filed: June 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey L Cureton
Referring Judge: Reed C O'Connor
Nature of Suit: Torts/Pers Inj: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER FOR REVISED JOINT STATUS REPORT AND MODIFIED INSTRUCTIONS FOR ELECTRONIC CASE FILING (ECF) (see order for specifics) (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L. Cureton on 7/29/2019) (tln)
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 CONSENT to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge by all parties and Order Reassigning Case. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L. Cureton for all further proceedings. Judge Reed C. O'Connor no longer assigned to case. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 7/26/2019) (skg)
July 19, 2019 Filing 4 Proposal for contents of scheduling and discovery order by Bloomin' Brands, Inc.. (Williams, Stefani)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REQUIRING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND REPORT FOR CONTENTS OF SCHEDULING ORDER: The Joint Report shall be filed on or before July 19, 2019. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 6/21/2019) (skg)
June 14, 2019 Filing 2 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. File to: Judge O Connor. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (bdb)
June 14, 2019 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Bloomin' Brands, Inc., Joshua Jefferson. (see doc #1 for image) (bdb)
June 14, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH JURY DEMAND from 348th District Court of Tarrant County, Texas, case number 348-304647-18 filed by Bloomin' Brands, Inc.. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0539-10051487) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet Ex. A, #2 Cover Sheet Supplement Ex. B, #3 Exhibit(s) Ex. C-1, #4 Exhibit(s) Ex. C-2, #5 Exhibit(s) Ex. C-3, #6 Exhibit(s) Ex. C-4, #7 Exhibit(s) Ex. D) (Williams, Stefani)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Slater v. Jefferson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela Slater
Represented By: Dominic M V Braus
Represented By: Ryan Luna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bloomin' Brands, Inc.
Represented By: Stefani Rashal Williams
Represented By: Nichol L Bunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joshua Jefferson
Represented By: Stefani Rashal Williams
Represented By: Nichol L Bunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?