Burch et al v. America's Servcing Company et al
Appellee: Hughes Watters Askanase LLP and America's Servcing Company
Appellant: William Paul Burch
Not Yet Classified: Case Admin Sup and Mark X Mullin
Case Number: 4:2019cv00470
Filed: June 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Reed C O'Connor
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy: Appeal 28 USC 158
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 30, 2019 Filing 8 RESPONSE filed by Hughes Watters Askanase LLP re: #7 MOTION for Reconsideration (Harrell, C)
July 21, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Reconsideration filed by William Paul Burch (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) EXHIBIT 1, #2 Exhibit(s) EXHIBIT 2, #3 Exhibit(s) EXHIBIT A, #4 Exhibit(s) EXHIBIT B, #5 Exhibit(s) EXHIBIT C, #6 Exhibit(s) EXHIBIT D, #7 Exhibit(s) EXHIBIT E, #8 Exhibit(s) EXHIBIT F, #9 Exhibit(s) EXHIBIT G, #10 Exhibit(s) EXHIBIT H, #11 Exhibit(s) EXHIBIT I, #12 Exhibit(s) EXHIBIT J, #13 Exhibit(s) EXHIBIT K, #14 Exhibit(s) EXHIBIT 3, #15 Exhibit(s) EXHIBIT 4) (Burch, William)
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Based on the foregoing, the Court DENIES Appellant's Motion for Extension of Time (ECF No. #4 ). (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 7/11/2019) (skg)
July 9, 2019 Filing 5 RESPONSE filed by America's Servcing Company, Hughes Watters Askanase LLP re: #4 Ex Parte MOTION to Extend Time (Harrell, C)
July 6, 2019 Filing 4 Ex Parte MOTION to Extend Time filed by William Paul Burch (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) EXHIBIT A) (Burch, William)
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: This Court therefore finds that Appellant failed to timely file his notice of appeal and that this Court lacks jurisdiction to hear the appeal. Accordingly, the Court DISMISSES this case with prejudice. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 6/27/2019) (skg)
June 14, 2019 Filing 2 Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party. (bdb)
June 14, 2019 New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. No prior sanctions found. (For court use only - links to the #national and #circuit indexes.) File to: Judge O Connor. (bdb)
June 14, 2019 Filing 1 Pursuant to Fed. R. Bankr. P. 8003(d), the bankruptcy clerk has transmitted the notice of appeal filed in #bankruptcy case number 18-4172-MXM and the notice of appeal has now been docketed in the district court in case 4:19-cv-470. (The filing fee is due to the Bankruptcy Court.) Pursuant to #Fed. R. Bankr. P. 8009, before the record on appeal can be assembled and filed in the district court, designations of items to be included in the record on appeal and statements of issues must be filed in the bankruptcy case. If a sealed document is designated, the designating party must file a motion in the district court case for the document to be accepted under seal. See also #District Court Local Bankruptcy Rule 8012.1. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: #Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Appeal, Order Appealed, Docket Sheets for main and related cases) (Levario - BK, Tandi)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Burch et al v. America's Servcing Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Hughes Watters Askanase LLP
Represented By: C Ed Harrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: America's Servcing Company
Represented By: Nicola M Shiels
Represented By: Arthur E Anthony
Represented By: Robert T Mowrey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: William Paul Burch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Case Admin Sup
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Mark X Mullin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?