Grey v. Second Round LP et al
Plaintiff: Jeff Grey, Jr
Defendant: Second Round LP and Second Round Sub, LLC
Case Number: 4:2019cv00478
Filed: June 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Terry R Means
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER TO SUBMIT JOINT STATUS REPORT AND PROPOSED DISCOVERY PLAN: The parties are ordered to electronically file with the clerk of the court the signed joint status report and proposed discovery plan (one instrument) within 28 days of the date of the filing of this order. (see order) (Ordered by Senior Judge Terry R Means on 8/12/2019) (tln)
August 7, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Second Round LP, Second Round Sub, LLC. (Atkinson, Darryl)
August 7, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,, with Jury Demand filed by Second Round LP, Second Round Sub, LLC. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Attorney Darryl E Atkinson added to party Second Round LP(pty:dft), Attorney Darryl E Atkinson added to party Second Round Sub, LLC(pty:dft) (Atkinson, Darryl)
July 24, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Agreed Extension of time filed by Jeff Grey, Jr (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Jaffer, Shawn)
July 3, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Second Round Sub, LLC ; served on 7/3/2019. (Jaffer, Shawn)
July 3, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Second Round LP ; served on 7/3/2019. (Jaffer, Shawn)
June 18, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Second Round LP, Second Round Sub, LLC. (wxc)
June 18, 2019 Filing 2 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. File to: Judge Means. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (wxc)
June 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against All Defendants filed by Grey Jeff, Jr. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-10058439) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (Jaffer, Shawn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Grey v. Second Round LP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeff Grey, Jr
Represented By: Shawn Jaffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Second Round LP
Represented By: Darryl E Atkinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Second Round Sub, LLC
Represented By: Darryl E Atkinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?