Davis v. Weatherford Municipal Court et al
Plaintiff: Mayford Kenneth Davis, Jr
Defendant: Catherine Zellers, Tiffany Bagwell and Weatherford Municipal Court
Case Number: 4:2019cv00502
Filed: June 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Reed C O'Connor
Referring Judge: Mark Pittman
2 Judge: Hal R Ray
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 19, 2019 Filing 20 REPLY filed by Tiffany Bagwell, Weatherford Municipal Court, Catherine Zellers re: #10 MOTION to Dismiss , #9 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) (Davis, Robert)
August 13, 2019 Filing 19 RESPONSE filed by Mayford Kenneth Davis, Jr re: #10 MOTION to Dismiss , #9 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6). (tln)
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Special Order 3-329: On 8/8/19 the clerk is to reassign Fort Worth cases that are listed in the order and assigned to Senior District Judge McBryde and District Judge O'Connor to Judge Mark Pittman, and the cases will carry the suffix letter "P." (The clerk has mailed a copy to all non-ECF users.) (Ordered by Chief Judge Barbara M. G. Lynn on 8/8/2019) (cea)
August 6, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:17. Tue Aug 6 09:39:26 CDT 2019 (crt)
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #15 Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff shall file his response to the Motion to Dismiss of Defendants Zellers and Bagwell on or before August 26, 2019. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Hal R. Ray, Jr on 8/6/2019) (plp)
August 1, 2019 Filing 16 RESPONSE filed by Tiffany Bagwell, Catherine Zellers re: #15 MOTION to Extend Time (Davis, Robert)
July 31, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for Extension of Time filed by Mayford Kenneth Davis, Jr (wrb)
July 29, 2019 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Weatherford Municipal Court ; served by cmrr on 7/23/2019. (wrb)
July 25, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:13. Thu Jul 25 09:52:54 CDT 2019 (crt)
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: Plaintiff shall file his responses to the Motions ( #9 , #10 , #12 )on or before August 14, 2019. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Hal R. Ray, Jr on 7/25/2019) (skg)
July 24, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Stay filed by Tiffany Bagwell, Catherine Zellers with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Davis, Robert)
July 24, 2019 Filing 11 Appendix in Support filed by Tiffany Bagwell, Catherine Zellers re #10 MOTION to Dismiss (Davis, Robert)
July 24, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Tiffany Bagwell, Catherine Zellers with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Davis, Robert)
July 24, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) filed by Weatherford Municipal Court with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Weatherford Municipal Court's Motion to Dismiss)Attorney Robert Jacob Davis added to party Weatherford Municipal Court(pty:dft) (Davis, Robert)
July 24, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Tiffany Bagwell, Weatherford Municipal Court, Catherine Zellers. (Davis, Robert)
July 18, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:7. Thu Jul 18 15:18:17 CDT 2019 (crt)
July 18, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Tiffany Bagwell, Weatherford Municipal Court, Catherine Zellers. (bdb)
July 18, 2019 Filing 6 Request for Clerk to issue Summons filed by Mayford Kenneth Davis, Jr. (bdb)
July 15, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Mayford Kenneth Davis, Jr re #1 Complaint,, (wrb)
June 26, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:3,4. cy to Davis Jr Wed Jun 26 16:26:56 CDT 2019 (crt)
June 26, 2019 Filing 4 Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party (wrb)
June 26, 2019 Filing 3 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. CASREF case referral set (see Special Order 3). Magistrate Judge Ray preliminarily assigned. No prior sanctions found. (For court use only - links to the #national and #circuit indexes.) File to: No court file needed. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (wrb)
June 26, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Mayford Kenneth Davis, Jr. (wrb)
June 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against All Defendants filed by Mayford Kenneth Davis, Jr. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number FW032876) Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (wrb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davis v. Weatherford Municipal Court et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Catherine Zellers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tiffany Bagwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Weatherford Municipal Court
Represented By: Robert Jacob Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mayford Kenneth Davis, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?