Davis v. City of Hudson Oaks et al
Plaintiff: Mayford Kenneth Davis, Jr
Defendant: John Doe, City of Hudson Oaks and Joni May
Case Number: 4:2019cv00503
Filed: June 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: John McBryde
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 14, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:17,18. Wed Aug 14 16:53:45 CDT 2019 (crt)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 FINAL JUDGMENT: Consistent with the order signed this date, the court ORDERS, ADJUDGES, and DECREES that the claims of plaintiff, Mayford Kenneth Davis, Jr., against defendants, City of Hudson Oaks, John Doe, and Joni May, be, and are hereby dismissed. The court further ORDERS, ADJUDGES, and DECREES that defendants City of Hudson Oaks and Joni May have and recover their court costs from plaintiff. (Ordered by Senior Judge John McBryde on 8/14/2019) (tln)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #13 Motion to Dismiss. The court ORDERS that the motion to dismiss be, and is hereby, granted, and plaintiff's claims against all defendants be, and are hereby, dismissed. (Ordered by Senior Judge John McBryde on 8/14/2019) (tln)
August 13, 2019 Filing 16 RESPONSE filed by Mayford Kenneth Davis, Jr re: #13 MOTION to Dismiss (npk)
August 8, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:17,18. Thu Aug 8 16:28:19 CDT 2019 (crt)
August 1, 2019 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Joni May ; served on 7/23/2019. (bdb)
July 22, 2019 Filing 14 Appendix in Support filed by City of Hudson Oaks, Joni May re #13 MOTION to Dismiss. (bdb)
July 22, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss filed by City of Hudson Oaks, Joni May with Brief in Support. (bdb)
July 19, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:7. Fri Jul 19 15:30:31 CDT 2019 (crt)
July 19, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:12. Fri Jul 19 11:38:30 CDT 2019 (crt)
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Order Unfiling/Striking #8 MOTION to Dismiss filed by City of Hudson Oaks, #10 Appendix in Support filed by City of Hudson Oaks, Joni May due to the following deficiency: Per #5 Standing ORDER Concerning Paper Filing, the appendix does not meet the requirements set forth in the form status report order available at http://www.txnd.uscourts.qov/sites/defaultlfiles/documents/McBrydeStatusReportOrder.pdf. If defendants wish to retrieve these items from the clerk's office, they may do so by 4:00 p.m. on July 22, 2019. Otherwise, the clerk will dispose of them as she sees fit. (see order) (Ordered by Senior Judge John McBryde on 7/19/2019) (tln)
July 18, 2019 Filing 11 Defendants' Certificate of Interested Persons by City of Hudson Oaks, Joni May. (wxc)
July 18, 2019 Filing 10 ***UNFILED PER #12 ORDER***Defendants City of Hudson Oaks and Joni May's Appendix in Support of their Motion to Dismiss filed by City of Hudson Oaks, Joni May re #8 (wxc) Modified text on 7/19/2019 (tln).
July 18, 2019 Filing 9 Defendants City of Hudson Oaks and Jony May's Motion to Stay Discovery and Abatement of Any Order for Rule 26 Conference Pending Determination of Their Motion to Dismiss and Immunities filed by City of Hudson Oaks, Joni May (wxc)
July 18, 2019 Filing 8 ***UNFILED PER #12 ORDER***Defendants City of Hudson Oaks and Joni May's Motion to Dismiss and Brief in Support filed by City of Hudson Oaks, Joni May (wxc) Modified text on 7/19/2019 (tln).
July 18, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to City of Hudson Oaks, John Doe, Joni May. (wxc)
July 18, 2019 Filing 6 Request for Clerk to issue Summons filed by Mayford Kenneth Davis, Jr. (wxc)
June 26, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:3, 4, 5. Wed Jun 26 14:38:19 CDT 2019 (crt)
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Standing ORDER Concerning Paper Filing in Cases Assigned to District Judge John McBryde...see order for specifics. (Ordered by Senior Judge John McBryde on 6/26/2019) (bdb)
June 26, 2019 Filing 4 Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party. (bdb)
June 26, 2019 Filing 3 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. (For court use only - links to the #national index and to the prior sanctions found within the #circuit index.) File to Judge McBryde. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (bdb)
June 26, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Mayford Kenneth Davis, Jr. (bdb)
June 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against City of Hudson Oaks, John Doe, Joni May filed by Mayford Kenneth Davis, Jr. (Filing fee $400.00; Receipt number FW032876) Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (bdb) Modified on 6/27/2019 (bdb).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davis v. City of Hudson Oaks et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Hudson Oaks
Represented By: Robert Jacob Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joni May
Represented By: Robert Jacob Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mayford Kenneth Davis, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?