360 Hospitality LLC v. A.C. Furniture Company, Inc.
Plaintiff: 360 Hospitality LLC
Defendant: A.C. Furniture Company, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2019cv00531
Filed: July 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: John McBryde
Nature of Suit: Torts/Pers Prop: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 FINAL JUDGMENT...all claims by plaintiff or defendant against each other are dismissed with prejudice; each party bear its own court costs and attorney's fees. (Ordered by Senior Judge John McBryde on 8/22/2019) (wrb)
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 AGREED ORDER granting #15 Agreed Joint Motion to Dismiss with Prejudice (Ordered by Senior Judge John McBryde on 8/22/2019) (wrb)
August 22, 2019 Filing 15 AGREED MOTION to Dismiss With Prejudice filed by 360 Hospitality LLC, A.C. Furniture Company, Inc. (wrb)
August 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Motion to Continue. Amended complaint due by 8/30/2019. (Ordered by Senior Judge John McBryde on 8/17/2019) (wrb)
August 16, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE filed by 360 Hospitality LLC. (tln)
August 2, 2019 Answer due from A.C. Furniture Company, Inc. on 8/30/2019. (wrb)
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER FOR REPLEADING... Plaintiff file an amended pleading to be titled "Plaintiff's Amended Complaint by Aug 16 2019. Defendant to file answer or other response by Aug 30 2019. (Ordered by Senior Judge John McBryde on 8/2/2019) (wrb)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 2/13/2020. Discovery due by 4/13/2020. Pretrial Conference set for 5/4/2020 09:30 AM before Senior Judge John McBryde. Joinder of Parties due by 11/13/2019. Jury Trial set for 6/8/2020 09:00 AM before Senior Judge John McBryde. (Ordered by Senior Judge John McBryde on 8/1/2019) (wrb)
July 31, 2019 Filing 10 JOINT STATUS REPORT filed by 360 Hospitality LLC, A.C. Furniture Company, Inc. (tln)
July 25, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by 360 Hospitality LLC. (tln)
July 23, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jonathan Alexander Gitlin on behalf of A.C. Furniture Company, Inc.. (wrb)
July 10, 2019 Filing 7 Judge McBryde's paper original and copies pursuant tot he standing order of Documents #1 , #2 received. (wxc)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order Unfiling #5 Orig and Judge's Copies filed by A.C. Furniture Company, Inc. due to the following deficiency: per standing order, doc must contain original signatures. re: #5 Notice (Other), (Ordered by Senior Judge John McBryde on 7/9/2019) (wrb)
July 8, 2019 Filing 5 [unfiled per order of 7/9/19] Received original and copy set of case initiating documents pursuant to Standing order (NOD) re: #2 Cert. Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement, #1 Notice of Removal filed by A.C. Furniture Company, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Additional Page(s) COIP) (wrb) Modified on 7/9/2019 (wrb).
July 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Standing ORDER Concerning Paper Filing in Cases Assigned to District Judge John McBryde...see order for specifics. (Ordered by Senior Judge John McBryde on 7/5/2019) (wrb)
July 5, 2019 Filing 3 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. File to Judge McBryde. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (wrb)
July 3, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by A.C. Furniture Company, Inc.. (Reid, William)
July 3, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from County Court at Law No. 3, Tarrant County, Texas, case number 2019-002157-3 filed by A.C. Furniture Company, Inc.. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0539-10095575) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Cover Sheet, #3 Cover Sheet Supplement) (Reid, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: 360 Hospitality LLC v. A.C. Furniture Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 360 Hospitality LLC
Represented By: Brandon Smith
Represented By: Jonathan Alexander Gitlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A.C. Furniture Company, Inc.
Represented By: William E Reid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?