Benjamin v. Equifax Information Services, LLC

Plaintiff: Laly Benjamin
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC and Equifax Information Services LLC
Case Number: 4:2019cv00544
Filed: July 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: John McBryde
Referring Judge: Mark Pittman
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 9, 2019 Clerk's notice to ECF Users in cases transferred under SO 3-329 from Judge John McBryde to Judge Mark Pittman: Judge Pittman permits electronic filing. His copy requirements for electronically filed documents are as follows: Sealed documents, dispositive motions, responses, replies, and appendices thereto and filings more than 25 pages in length, placed in a 3-ring binder, with exhibits or attachments tabbed, indexed, and bound. Delivery instructions are available in the link to the Judges' Copy Requirements found at the top of the notice of electronic filing sent to affected ECF users. (lrl)
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Special Order 3-329: On 8/8/19 the clerk is to reassign Fort Worth cases that are listed in the order and assigned to Senior District Judge McBryde and District Judge O'Connor to Judge Mark Pittman, and the cases will carry the suffix letter "P." (The clerk has mailed a copy to all non-ECF users.) (Ordered by Chief Judge Barbara M. G. Lynn on 8/8/2019) (cea)
August 8, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Equifax Information Services LLC ; served on 8/5/2019. (edm)
August 2, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Equifax Information Services LLC. (edm)
July 30, 2019 Filing 7 Payment for #1 Complaint,,,, filed by Laly Benjamin. ($400; Receipt number 0539-10151339). (Jaffer, Shawn)
July 23, 2019 Filing 6 Payment for #1 Complaint,,,, filed by Laly Benjamin. ($400; Receipt number 0539-10135421). (Jaffer, Shawn)
July 11, 2019 Filing 5 Judge McBryde's paper original and copies pursuant to the standing order of document #1 , and #2 filed by Laly Benjamin. (edm)
July 10, 2019 Summons will not issue at this time as requested per #1 Complaint because filing fee has not been paid. (edm)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Standing ORDER Concerning Paper Filing in Cases Assigned to District Judge John McBryde...see order for specifics. (Ordered by Senior Judge John McBryde on 7/10/2019) (edm)
July 10, 2019 Filing 3 New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. File to Judge McBryde. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (edm)
July 10, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Laly Benjamin. (Jaffer, Shawn)
July 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Equifax Information Services, LLC filed by Laly Benjamin. (Filer fee not paid) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (Jaffer, Shawn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Benjamin v. Equifax Information Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laly Benjamin
Represented By: Shawn Jaffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?