OHC/GP I, Ltd et al v. RCC Guaranteed SLP II, L.P. - Series C et al
Appellee: RCC Guaranteed SLP II, L.P. - Series C and Centerline Guaranteed Corporate Partners II, L.P. - Series C
Not Yet Classified: Case Admin Sup and Mark X Mullin
Appellant: OHC/GP I, Ltd and OHC/GP I Ltd
Case Number: 4:2019cv00546
Filed: July 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Terry R Means
Referring Judge: Mark Pittman
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy: Appeal 28 USC 158
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 6, 2019 Filing 5 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Appeal filed by OHC/GP I Ltd (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Robert A Simon added to party OHC/GP I Ltd(pty:a) (Simon, Robert)
August 13, 2019 Filing 4 Notice of transmission of bankruptcy record on appeal for < number 19-41454-mxm11. Pursuant to < 8010, the bankruptcy clerk has transmitted the record on appeal to the U.S. District Court. See Fed. R. Bankr. P. 8018 for information on briefing times. (Attachments: #1 Vol 1, #2 Vol 2, #3 Vol 3, #4 Vol 4, #5 Vol 5, #6 Vol 6) (Rueter - BK, Karyn)
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Special Order 3-329: On 8/8/19 the clerk is to reassign Fort Worth cases that are listed in the order and assigned to Senior District Judge McBryde and District Judge O'Connor to Judge Mark Pittman, and the cases will carry the suffix letter "P." (The clerk has mailed a copy to all non-ECF users.) (Ordered by Chief Judge Barbara M. G. Lynn on 8/8/2019) (cea)
July 15, 2019 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. File to: Judge O Connor. (npk)
July 15, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:2. Mon Jul 15 14:31:07 CDT 2019 (crt)
July 15, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:2. Mon Jul 15 14:29:17 CDT 2019 (crt)
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER FOR REASSIGNMENT. The undersigned judge, having taken senior status, desires to have this case re-assigned to an active-status judge. The clerk of the Court is therefore DIRECTED to re-assign this case by random draw to another judge. Case reassigned to Judge Reed C. O'Connor for all further proceedings. Senior Judge Terry R Means no longer assigned to case. (Ordered by Senior Judge Terry R Means on 7/15/2019) (npk)
July 11, 2019 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. File to: Judge Means. (npk)
July 11, 2019 Filing 1 Pursuant to Fed. R. Bankr. P. 8003(d), the bankruptcy clerk has transmitted the notice of appeal filed in #bankruptcy case number 19-41454-mxm11 and the notice of appeal has now been docketed in the district court in case 4:19-cv-546. (The filing fee has been paid in the Bankruptcy Court.) Pursuant to #Fed. R. Bankr. P. 8009, before the record on appeal can be assembled and filed in the district court, designations of items to be included in the record on appeal and statements of issues must be filed in the bankruptcy case. If a sealed document is designated, the designating party must file a motion in the district court case for the document to be accepted under seal. See also #District Court Local Bankruptcy Rule 8012.1. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: #Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Notice of appeal) (Rueter - BK, Karyn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: OHC/GP I, Ltd et al v. RCC Guaranteed SLP II, L.P. - Series C et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: RCC Guaranteed SLP II, L.P. - Series C
Represented By: Daniel Joseph Ferretti
Represented By: Laura E. Carlisle
Represented By: Steven F. Griffith, Jr.
Represented By: Steven F Griffith, Jr
Represented By: Laura E Carlisle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Centerline Guaranteed Corporate Partners II, L.P. - Series C
Represented By: Daniel Joseph Ferretti
Represented By: Laura E. Carlisle
Represented By: Steven F. Griffith, Jr.
Represented By: Steven F Griffith, Jr
Represented By: Laura E Carlisle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Case Admin Sup
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Mark X Mullin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: OHC/GP I, Ltd
Represented By: Frances A Smith
Represented By: Judith Weaver Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: OHC/GP I Ltd
Represented By: Frances A Smith
Represented By: Judith Weaver Ross
Represented By: Robert A Simon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?