Phillips v. Davis-Director TDCJ-CID
Petitioner: Adrian Devone Phillips
Respondent: Lorie Davis-Director TDCJ-CID
Case Number: 4:2019cv00563
Filed: July 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Reed C O'Connor
Referring Judge: Mark Pittman
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Pet/Habeas Corpus: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 21, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jennifer Louise Wissinger on behalf of Lorie Davis-Director TDCJ-CID. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Wissinger, Jennifer)
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Special Order 3-329: On 8/8/19 the clerk is to reassign Fort Worth cases that are listed in the order and assigned to Senior District Judge McBryde and District Judge O'Connor to Judge Mark Pittman, and the cases will carry the suffix letter "P." (The clerk has mailed a copy to all non-ECF users.) (Ordered by Chief Judge Barbara M. G. Lynn on 8/8/2019) (cea)
July 29, 2019 Filing 6 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE re #5 Order to Show Cause/Order to Answer, and supporting documents have been received by the Office of the Texas Attorney General. (skg)
July 26, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:5. Fri Jul 26 15:38:28 CDT 2019 (crt)
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER PERMITTING PROCEEDING IN THE DISTRICT COURT and ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE, NOTICE, AND INSTRUCTIONS TO PARTIES: The clerk will electronically serve this order, the petition, and supporting documents to the designee for the Office of the Texas Attorney General. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 7/26/2019) (skg)
July 17, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:4. , and a form application to proceed IFP and form 2254 has been mailed to petitioner for completition. Wed Jul 17 10:35:28 CDT 2019 (crt)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER CONSTRUING FEDERAL PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS UNDER 28 U.S.C. 2241 AS A PETITION FOR A WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS UNDER 28 U.S.C. 2254 AND NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY: Adrian Devone Phillips must address the following deficiency: A $5.00 filing fee has not been paid nor has an application to proceed in forma pauperis and certificate of inmate trust account been submitted; A form 2254 petition for habeas corpus relief has not been filed. Failure to comply with this order may lead to dismissal for failure to prosecute pursuant to FRCvP 41(b). Deadline to cure the deficiency is 30 days. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 7/17/2019) (skg)
July 16, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:2,3. Tue Jul 16 15:23:17 CDT 2019 (crt)
July 16, 2019 Filing 3 Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party (npk)
July 16, 2019 Filing 2 New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. (For court use only - links to the #national index and to the prior sanctions found within the #circuit index.) File to: If the last digit of this case is an ODD number route file to staff attorney PW. If the last digit is an EVEN number route file to staff attorney DK. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (npk)
July 16, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus under 28 USC 2241 filed by Adrian Devone Phillips. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) C, #2 Exhibit(s) D) (npk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Phillips v. Davis-Director TDCJ-CID
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Lorie Davis-Director TDCJ-CID
Represented By: Jennifer Louise Wissinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Adrian Devone Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?