Mawia et al v. Sumo Sushi LLC et al
Plaintiff: Vung San Dim and Lal Nun Mawia
Defendant: Sumo Sushi LLC and Joong Tuetkin
Case Number: 4:2019cv00603
Filed: August 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: John McBryde
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, filed by Sumo Sushi LLC, Joong Tuetkin. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Attorney Leslie J Burgoyne added to party Sumo Sushi LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Leslie J Burgoyne added to party Joong Tuetkin(pty:dft) (npk)
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STATUS REPORT ORDER: Joint Status Report due by 10/9/2019. (Ordered by Senior Judge John McBryde on 9/9/2019) (npk)
August 9, 2019 Filing 7 Received original and judge copies of case initiating documents pursuant to Standing Order re: #2 Cert. Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement, #1 Complaint filed by Vung San Dim, Lal Nun Mawia (Attachments: #1 Additional Page(s) coip) (wrb)
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: The court ORDERS that by 4:00 p.m. on August 12, 2019, plaintiffs file paper copies of the documents electronically filed on August 2, 2019, as required by the standing order. Failure to comply with this order may result in the dismissal of plaintiffs' claims without further notice. (Ordered by Senior Judge John McBryde on 8/8/2019) (tln)
August 5, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Sumo Sushi LLC, Joong Tuetkin. (tln)
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Standing ORDER Concerning Paper Filing in Cases Assigned to District Judge John McBryde...see order for specifics. (Ordered by Senior Judge John McBryde on 8/5/2019) (tln)
August 5, 2019 Filing 3 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. File to Judge McBryde. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (tln)
August 2, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Vung San Dim, Lal Nun Mawia. (Chaudhari, Papool)
August 2, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Sumo Sushi LLC, Joong Tuetkin filed by Lal Nun Mawia, Vung San Dim. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-10164210) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit(s) A) (Chaudhari, Papool)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mawia et al v. Sumo Sushi LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vung San Dim
Represented By: Papool S Chaudhari
Represented By: Sul Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lal Nun Mawia
Represented By: Papool S Chaudhari
Represented By: Sul Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sumo Sushi LLC
Represented By: Leslie J Burgoyne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joong Tuetkin
Represented By: Leslie J Burgoyne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?