Odom v. USHEALTH Advisors, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Jacob Odom
Defendant: USHealth Group, Inc. and USHEALTH Advisors, LLC
Case Number: 4:2019cv00631
Filed: August 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Mark Pittman
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 47:227
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2019 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by USHealth Group, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Golden Rule Financial Corporation. for USHealth Group, Inc.. (Backman, Jeffrey)
September 30, 2019 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by USHEALTH Advisors, LLC identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate USHealth Group, Inc. for USHEALTH Advisors, LLC. (Backman, Jeffrey)
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #12 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Gregg I. Strock. Important Reminder: Unless excused for cause, an attorney who is not an ECF user must register within 14 days of the date the attorney appears in a case pursuant to LR 5.1(f) and LCrR 49.2(g). (Ordered by Judge Mark Pittman on 9/30/2019) (chmb)(IBH)
September 27, 2019 Filing 12 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $100; Receipt number 0539-10297415) filed by USHEALTH Advisors, LLC, USHealth Group, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice)Attorney Gregg Ian Strock added to party USHEALTH Advisors, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Gregg Ian Strock added to party USHealth Group, Inc. (pty:dft) (Strock, Gregg)
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REQUIRING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND REPORT FOR CONTENTS OF SCHEDULING ORDER...Lead counsel for each party shall confer no later than Oct 20 2019; Joint Report due on or before Oct 24 2019. (Ordered by Judge Mark Pittman on 9/26/2019) (wrb)
September 25, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,, filed by USHEALTH Advisors, LLC. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Backman, Jeffrey)
September 25, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,, filed by USHealth Group, Inc.. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Backman, Jeffrey)
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #7 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Jeffrey A. Backman. Important Reminder: Unless excused for cause, an attorney who is not an ECF user must register within 14 days of the date the attorney appears in a case pursuant to LR 5.1(f) and LCrR 49.2(g). (Ordered by Judge Mark Pittman on 9/25/2019) (chmb)(IBH)
September 24, 2019 Filing 7 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $100; Receipt number 0539-10289944) filed by USHEALTH Advisors, LLC, USHealth Group, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice) (Backman, Jeffrey)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Before the Court is Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint (ECF No. #5 ), filed September 11, 2019. Defendants request an extension to September 25, 2019, to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Having considered the motion, the Court finds that it should be and is hereby GRANTED. Accordingly, Defendants are ORDERED to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint on or before September 25, 2019. (Ordered by Judge Mark Pittman on 9/12/2019) (tln)
September 11, 2019 Filing 5 Unopposed MOTION to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint filed by USHEALTH Advisors, LLC, USHealth Group, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Daniel L Bates added to party USHEALTH Advisors, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Daniel L Bates added to party USHealth Group, Inc. (pty:dft) (Bates, Daniel)
August 22, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Reissued as to USHEALTH Advisors, LLC, USHealth Group, Inc.. (wrb)
August 9, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to USHEALTH Advisors, LLC, USHealth Group, Inc.. (wrb)
August 9, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Jacob Odom. (Zadeh, Jamshyd (Jim))
August 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against All Defendants filed by Jacob Odom. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-10179375) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Zadeh, Jamshyd (Jim))

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Odom v. USHEALTH Advisors, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USHealth Group, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel L Bates
Represented By: Gregg Ian Strock
Represented By: Jeffrey A Backman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USHEALTH Advisors, LLC
Represented By: Daniel L Bates
Represented By: Gregg Ian Strock
Represented By: Jeffrey A Backman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacob Odom
Represented By: Jamshyd (Jim) M Zadeh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?