USPA Accessories, LLC et al v. PromoSalesUSA et al
Plaintiff: USPA Accessories, LLC, FUL IPCO and FUL IPCO, LLC
Defendant: PromoSalesUSA and Prestige Business Solutions, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2019cv00641
Filed: August 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Terry R Means
Referring Judge: Mark Pittman
Nature of Suit: Property Rights: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:44
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2019 Filing 11 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. File to: Judge Pittman. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. Attorneys are further reminded that, if necessary, they must comply with Local Rule 83.10(a) within 14 days or risk the possible dismissal of this case without prejudice or without further notice. (wxc)
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER FOR TRANSFER.... The undersigned judge, having taken senior status, desires that this case be re-assigned to an active-status judge. As a result, this case is hereby TRANSFERRED to the docket of United States District Judge Mark T. Pittman. All future documents filed in this case shall include the suffix letter "P" rather than "Y" at the end of the case number. (Ordered by Senior Judge Terry R Means on 10/9/2019) (wxc)
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer PromoSalesUSA answer due 11/6/2019. (Ordered by Senior Judge Terry R Means on 10/8/2019) (wrb)
October 4, 2019 Filing 8 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by PromoSalesUSA Attorney Philip A Vickers added to party PromoSalesUSA(pty:dft) (Vickers, Philip)
September 30, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Prestige Business Solutions, Inc.. (Francis, Michael)
September 30, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,, with Jury Demand filed by Prestige Business Solutions, Inc.. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Attorney Michael S Francis added to party Prestige Business Solutions, Inc.(pty:dft) (Francis, Michael)
August 15, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Prestige Business Solutions, Inc., PromoSalesUSA. (tln)
August 15, 2019 Filing 4 Report to Patent/Trademark Office of Initiating Document. Form AO 120 e-mailed to notice_of_suit@uspto.gov. (tln)
August 15, 2019 Filing 3 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. File to: Judge Means. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (tln)
August 14, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by FUL IPCO, USPA Accessories, LLC. (Malin, Steve)
August 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against All Defendants filed by USPA Accessories, LLC, FUL IPCO. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-10192447) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet Cover Sheet) (Malin, Steve)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: USPA Accessories, LLC et al v. PromoSalesUSA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PromoSalesUSA
Represented By: Philip A Vickers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prestige Business Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Michael S Francis
Represented By: Jennifer Ivett Montemayor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: USPA Accessories, LLC
Represented By: Steve Malin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FUL IPCO
Represented By: Steve Malin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FUL IPCO, LLC
Represented By: Steve Malin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?