Jariwala et al v. BMW of North America LLC
Plaintiff: Chandni Vihan, Manish Jariwala and Bhumi Jariwala
Defendant: BMW of North America LLC
Case Number: 4:2019cv00650
Filed: August 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Reed C O'Connor
Nature of Suit: Torts/Pers Inj: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Pers Inj/Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 16, 2019 Filing 6 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. File to: Judge O Connor. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (tln)
August 16, 2019 New case number 4:19-cv-00650-O Jariwala et al v. BMW of North America LLC has been opened following the order of transfer entered in case number 3:19cv1857-L. Future filings should be made in the FORT WORTH division and reflect the new case number as indicated. Clerk to complete new case processing and mail notice of this entry to any party who did not receive it electronically. (ldm)
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: The court grants Defendant's Unopposed Motion to Transfer Venue of Defendant BMW of North America, LLC (Doc. #4 ) and transfers this action to the Fort Worth Division of the Northern District of Texas. The clerk of court shall effect this transfer in accordance with the usual procedure. (Ordered by Judge Sam A. Lindsay on 8/16/2019) (aaa)
August 14, 2019 Filing 4 Agreed MOTION to Transfer Case out of District/Division filed by BMW of North America LLC with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Proposed Order, #3 Brief in Support of Unopposed Motion to Transfer Venue, #4 Exhibit(s)) (Myers, J)
August 7, 2019 Filing 3 Court Request for Recusal: Senior Judge A. Joe Fish recused. Pursuant to instruction in Special Order 3-249, the Clerk has reassigned the case to Judge Sam A. Lindsay for all further proceedings. Future filings should indicate the case number as: 3:19-cv-1857-L. (zkc)
August 5, 2019 Filing 2 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (axm)
August 5, 2019 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by BMW of North America LLC. (See document #1 -57 for image) (axm)
August 5, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH JURY DEMAND from County Court at Law No. 3, Dallas County, case number CC-18-06429-C filed by BMW of North America, LLC. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0539-10165145) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Cover Sheet Supplement, #3 Exhibit(s), #4 Exhibit(s), #5 Exhibit(s), #6 Exhibit(s), #7 Exhibit(s), #8 Exhibit(s), #9 Exhibit(s), #10 Exhibit(s), #11 Exhibit(s), #12 Exhibit(s), #13 Exhibit(s), #14 Exhibit(s), #15 Exhibit(s), #16 Exhibit(s), #17 Exhibit(s), #18 Exhibit(s), #19 Exhibit(s), #20 Exhibit(s), #21 Exhibit(s), #22 Exhibit(s), #23 Exhibit(s), #24 Exhibit(s), #25 Exhibit(s), #26 Exhibit(s), #27 Exhibit(s), #28 Exhibit(s), #29 Exhibit(s), #30 Exhibit(s), #31 Exhibit(s), #32 Exhibit(s), #33 Exhibit(s), #34 Exhibit(s), #35 Exhibit(s), #36 Exhibit(s), #37 Exhibit(s), #38 Exhibit(s), #39 Exhibit(s), #40 Exhibit(s), #41 Exhibit(s), #42 Exhibit(s), #43 Exhibit(s), #44 Exhibit(s), #45 Exhibit(s), #46 Exhibit(s), #47 Exhibit(s), #48 Exhibit(s), #49 Exhibit(s), #50 Exhibit(s), #51 Exhibit(s), #52 Exhibit(s), #53 Exhibit(s), #54 Exhibit(s), #55 Exhibit(s), #56 Exhibit(s), #57 Certificate of Interested Parties, #58 Notice (to State Court) of Removal) (Myers, J)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jariwala et al v. BMW of North America LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chandni Vihan
Represented By: Obair Ahmad Qudsi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Manish Jariwala
Represented By: Obair Ahmad Qudsi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bhumi Jariwala
Represented By: Obair Ahmad Qudsi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BMW of North America LLC
Represented By: J Michael Myers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?