Jones v. Bureau of Prisons et al
Plaintiff: Mark Jacob Jones, SR
Defendant: Officer O Vargas, Bureau of Prisons South Central Regional Office, Warden Eric Wilson, Officer NFN Delarm, Lieutenant NFN Marshall and Case Manager NFN Ivory
Case Number: 4:2019cv00662
Filed: August 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Reed C O'Connor
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Pet/Other: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 27, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:5, 6. Fri Sep 27 14:39:53 CDT 2019 (crt)
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 FINAL JUDGMENT: In accordance with the Court's order of dismissal entered this day and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 58, it is the final judgment of the Court that Mark Jones's civil-rights action is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. See FED. R. CIV. P. 58. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 9/27/2019) (skg)
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: Jones's action is therefore DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE for failure to prosecute. See FED. R. CIV. P. 41(b); see also Larson v. Scott, 157 F.3d 1030, 1031 (5th Cir. 1998). (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 9/27/2019) (skg)
August 26, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:4. , an application to proceed in forma pauperis; certificate of inmate trust account; and prisoner civil rights complaint have been mailed to plaintiff for completiton. Mon Aug 26 10:49:01 CDT 2019 (crt)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order: Mark Jones has not paid the $400.00 filing fee or filed an application to proceed in forma pauperis. Failure to comply with this order may lead to dismissal for failure to prosecute pursuant to FRCvP 41(b). Deadline to cure the deficiency is 9/26/2019. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 8/26/2019) (skg)
August 23, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:2,3. cy to Jones Sr Fri Aug 23 14:59:05 CDT 2019 (crt)
August 22, 2019 Filing 3 Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party (wrb)
August 22, 2019 Filing 2 New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. No prior sanctions found. (For court use only - links to the #national and #circuit indexes.) File to: No court file needed. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (wrb)
August 22, 2019 Filing 1 CIVIL COMPLAINT -"Motion Requesting a Preliminary Injunction and Permanent Injunction Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 65" against All Defendants filed by Mark Jacob Jones, SR. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (wrb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones v. Bureau of Prisons et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Jacob Jones, SR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer O Vargas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bureau of Prisons South Central Regional Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden Eric Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer NFN Delarm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lieutenant NFN Marshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Case Manager NFN Ivory
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?