Retirement Holdings LP Revocable Trust v. U.S. Bank, N.A. et al
Plaintiff: Retirement Holdings LP Revocable Trust
Defendant: Kelly J. Hill, Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc., U.S. Bank, N.A. and Select Portfolio Servicing Inc
Case Number: 4:2019cv00720
Filed: September 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: John McBryde
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 FINAL JUDGMENT: In accordance with the stipulations of dismissal filed on September 17, 2019, the court ORDERS, ADJUDGES, and DECREES that all claims and causes of action asserted by plaintiff, Retirement Holdings LP Revocable Trust, against defendants u.s. Bank, N.A. as Trustee for the GSAMP Trust 2007-HI, Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc., and Kelly J. Hill, be, and are hereby, dismissed without prejudice. (Ordered by Senior Judge John McBryde on 9/19/2019) (tln)
September 17, 2019 Filing 7 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE as to DEFENDANT KELLY J. HILL by Retirement Holdings LP Revocable Trust. (tln)
September 17, 2019 Filing 6 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE as to DEFENDANTS U.S. BANK, N.A. AS TRUSTEE FOR THE GSAMP TRUST 2007-HI and SELECT PORTFOLIO SERVICING, INC. by Retirement Holdings LP Revocable Trust, Select Portfolio Servicing Inc, U.S. Bank, N.A. (tln)
September 16, 2019 Filing 5 Judge McBryde's paper original and copy of #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Select Portfolio Servicing Inc, U.S. Bank, N.A. (tln)
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: The court ORDERS that defendants file an amended notice of removal alleging facts sufficient to show subject matter jurisdiction and a certificate of interested persons no later than 4:00 p.m. on September 18, 2019. The court further ORDERS that this action will be subject to remand if defendants fail to comply with this order. (see order) (Ordered by Senior Judge John McBryde on 9/11/2019) (tln)
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Standing ORDER Concerning Paper Filing in Cases Assigned to District Judge John McBryde...see order for specifics. (Ordered by Senior Judge John McBryde on 9/10/2019) (tln)
September 10, 2019 Filing 2 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. File to Judge McBryde. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (tln)
September 10, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 48th Judicial District Court, Tarrant County, TX, case number 048-310493-19 filed by Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc., U.S. Bank, N.A. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0539-10253619) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) C, #4 Exhibit(s) C-1, #5 Exhibit(s) C-2, #6 Exhibit(s) C-3, #7 Exhibit(s) C-4, #8 Exhibit(s) C-5, #9 Exhibit(s) C-6, #10 Exhibit(s) D, #11 Cover Sheet, #12 Cover Sheet Supplement) (Hord, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Retirement Holdings LP Revocable Trust v. U.S. Bank, N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kelly J. Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc.
Represented By: Eric C Mettenbrink
Represented By: Michael Foster Hord, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Eric C Mettenbrink
Represented By: Michael Foster Hord, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Select Portfolio Servicing Inc
Represented By: Eric C Mettenbrink
Represented By: Michael Foster Hord, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Retirement Holdings LP Revocable Trust
Represented By: Robert W Buchholz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?