Martin v. Davis-Director TDCJ-CID
Petitioner: Donn Deveral Martin
Respondent: Lorie Davis-Director TDCJ-CID
Case Number: 4:2019cv00743
Filed: September 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: John McBryde
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Pet/Habeas Corpus: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 18, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:7, 8, 9. Wed Sep 18 07:49:25 CDT 2019 (crt)
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Standing ORDER Concerning Paper Filing in Cases Assigned to District Judge John McBryde...see order for specifics. (Ordered by Senior Judge John McBryde on 9/18/2019) (bdb)
September 18, 2019 Filing 8 Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party. (bdb)
September 18, 2019 Filing 7 New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. (For court use only - links to the #national index and to the prior sanctions found within the #circuit index.) File to staff attorney PW. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (bdb)
September 17, 2019 New case number 4:19-cv-00743-A Martin v. Davis-Director TDCJ-CID has been opened following the order of transfer entered in case number 2:19cv0182-Z. Future filings should be made in the FORT WORTH division and reflect the new case number as indicated. Clerk to complete new case processing and mail notice of this entry to any party who did not receive it electronically. (ldm)
September 17, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:6. Tue Sep 17 16:44:01 CDT 2019 (crt)
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER transferring case to the Fort Worth Division of the Northern District of Texas. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lee Ann Reno on 9/17/2019) (awc)
September 17, 2019 Filing 5 ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to #3 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, by Petitioner Donn Deveral Martin. (nhp)
September 16, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:1,2. (Copy of first page of file-marked petition also mailed to petitioner.) Mon Sep 16 15:07:56 CDT 2019 (crt)
September 16, 2019 Filing 4 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Donn Deveral Martin re #3 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. (awc)
September 16, 2019 Filing 3 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Donn Deveral Martin. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (awc)
September 16, 2019 Filing 2 Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party. (awc)
September 16, 2019 Filing 1 New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. CASREF case referral set and case referred to Magistrate Judge Reno (see Special Order 3). Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Reno). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (awc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Martin v. Davis-Director TDCJ-CID
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Donn Deveral Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Lorie Davis-Director TDCJ-CID
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?