Fleming Hjorting as Trustee of the Hjorting Family Trust v. State Automobile Mutual Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Fleming Hjorting as Trustee of the Hjorting Family Trust
Defendant: State Automobile Mutual Insurance Company
Case Number: 4:2019cv00756
Filed: September 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Reed C O'Connor
Nature of Suit: Contract: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REQUIRING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND REPORT FOR CONTENTS OF SCHEDULING ORDER: The Joint Report shall be filed on or before December 16, 2019. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 11/15/2019) (skg)
November 14, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) filed by State Automobile Mutual Insurance Company Attorneys are further reminded that, if necessary, they must comply with Local Rule 83.10(a) within 14 days or risk the possible dismissal of this case without prejudice or without further notice. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1) (Songy, Lisa)
September 20, 2019 Filing 3 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. File to: Judge O Connor. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (npk)
September 20, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by State Automobile Mutual Insurance Company. (Songy, Lisa)
September 20, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH JURY DEMAND from 17th District Court, Tarrant County, case number 017-310366-19 filed by State Automobile Mutual Insurance Company. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0539-10280997) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Cover Sheet Supplement, #3 Exhibit(s) A Index of Documents, #4 Exhibit(s) B State Court Docket, #5 Exhibit(s) C1 State Court Petition, #6 Exhibit(s) C2 State Court service request, #7 Exhibit(s) C3 State Court Citation, #8 Exhibit(s) C4 State Court Answer, #9 Exhibit(s) C5 State Court Order for Sch Conf, #10 Exhibit(s) D Disclosure Statement) (Songy, Lisa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fleming Hjorting as Trustee of the Hjorting Family Trust v. State Automobile Mutual Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fleming Hjorting as Trustee of the Hjorting Family Trust
Represented By: Jonathan Parkey Ayers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Automobile Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Lisa A Songy
Represented By: Leo John Jordan, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?