BNSF Railway Company et al v. International Association of Sheet Metal, Air, Rail and Transportation Workers - Transportation Division
Plaintiff: Norfolk Southern Railway Company, Union Pacific Railroad Company, The Belt Railway Company of Chicago, BNSF Railway Company, Illinois Central Railroad Company, Grand Trunk Western Railroad Company, CSX Transportation, Inc. and The Kansas City Southern Railway Company
Defendant: International Association of Sheet Metal, Air, Rail and Transportation Workers - Transportation Division
Case Number: 4:2019cv00789
Filed: October 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Mark Pittman
Nature of Suit: Labor: Railway Labor Act
Cause of Action: 45:151
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 27, 2019 Filing 36 Appendix in Support filed by International Association of Sheet Metal, Air, Rail and Transportation Workers - Transportation Division re #34 Response/Objection, #35 Brief/Memorandum in Support of Motion, in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion [ECF 18] for Preliminary Injunction (Denison, Sanford)
November 27, 2019 Filing 35 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by International Association of Sheet Metal, Air, Rail and Transportation Workers - Transportation Division re #34 Response/Objection in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Denison, Sanford)
November 27, 2019 Filing 34 RESPONSE filed by International Association of Sheet Metal, Air, Rail and Transportation Workers - Transportation Division re: #18 MOTION for Injunction (Denison, Sanford)
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #31 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Shawn M. McKinley. Important Reminder: Unless excused for cause, an attorney who is not an ECF user must register within 14 days of the date the attorney appears in a case pursuant to LR 5.1(f) and LCrR 49.2(g). (Ordered by Judge Mark Pittman on 11/25/2019) (chmb)(twi)
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #30 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Erika A. Diehl-Gibbons. Important Reminder: Unless excused for cause, an attorney who is not an ECF user must register within 14 days of the date the attorney appears in a case pursuant to LR 5.1(f) and LCrR 49.2(g). (Ordered by Judge Mark Pittman on 11/25/2019) (chmb)(twi)
November 22, 2019 Filing 31 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney Shawn M. McKinley (Filing fee $100; Receipt number 0539-10432462) filed by International Association of Sheet Metal, Air, Rail and Transportation Workers - Transportation Division (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Denison, Sanford)
November 22, 2019 Filing 30 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney Erika A. Diehl-Gibbons (Filing fee $100; Receipt number 0539-10431614) filed by International Association of Sheet Metal, Air, Rail and Transportation Workers - Transportation Division (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Denison, Sanford)
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #26 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Kevin C. Brodar. Important Reminder: Unless excused for cause, an attorney who is not an ECF user must register within 14 days of the date the attorney appears in a case pursuant to LR 5.1(f) and LCrR 49.2(g). (Ordered by Judge Mark Pittman on 11/18/2019) (chmb)(cpb)
November 15, 2019 Filing 28 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by International Association of Sheet Metal, Air, Rail and Transportation Workers - Transportation Division. (Denison, Sanford)
November 15, 2019 Filing 27 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,,, filed by International Association of Sheet Metal, Air, Rail and Transportation Workers - Transportation Division. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Attorneys are further reminded that, if necessary, they must comply with Local Rule 83.10(a) within 14 days or risk the possible dismissal of this case without prejudice or without further notice., COUNTERCLAIM against BNSF Railway Company, CSX Transportation, Inc., Grand Trunk Western Railroad Company, Illinois Central Railroad Company, Norfolk Southern Railway Company, The Belt Railway Company of Chicago, The Kansas City Southern Railway Company, Union Pacific Railroad Company filed by International Association of Sheet Metal, Air, Rail and Transportation Workers - Transportation Division (Denison, Sanford)
November 15, 2019 Filing 26 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Clerk Note: Filer states no fee is to be collected due to prior payment or waiver by MO 16 or prior order.) filed by International Association of Sheet Metal, Air, Rail and Transportation Workers - Transportation Division (Brodar, Kevin)
November 15, 2019 Filing 25 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $100; Receipt number 0539-10411230) filed by International Association of Sheet Metal, Air, Rail and Transportation Workers - Transportation Division (Brodar, Kevin)
November 12, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE of Compliance/Certificate of Service re: #23 Order Setting Deadline/Hearing, filed by BNSF Railway Company, The Kansas City Southern Railway Company, CSX Transportation, Inc., Grand Trunk Western Railroad Company, Norfolk Southern Railway Company, Illinois Central Railroad Company, Union Pacific Railroad Company, The Belt Railway Company of Chicago. (Cawyer, Russell)
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER re #18 Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction: Plaintiffs shall serve Defendant's counsel with a copy of this order no later than November 14, 2019 and shall file a certificate of service reflecting that such service has been made and the manner in which it was made. It is, therefore, ORDERED that Defendant shall file a Response brief to Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction on or before November 27, 2019. It is further ORDERED that Plaintiffs may file a Reply to Defendant's Response, if any, no later than December 9, 2019. Plaintiffs' Reply shall not contain additional evidence. It is further ORDERED that, if the Court concludes that an evidentiary hearing on Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction is necessary, it will be held at 9:00 a.m. on Thursday, December 19, 2019, in the Fifth Floor Courtroom of the Eldon B. Mahon United States Courthouse, located at 501 W. 10th Street, Fort Worth, Texas. The Court will notify the parties after reviewing all of the submissions whether the hearing will be held. (Ordered by Judge Mark Pittman on 11/12/2019) (tln)
November 8, 2019 Filing 22 Joint MOTION TO SET BRIEFING SCHEDULE by BNSF Railway Company, CSX Transportation, Inc., Grand Trunk Western Railroad Company, Illinois Central Railroad Company, Norfolk Southern Railway Company, The Belt Railway Company of Chicago, The Kansas City Southern Railway Company, Union Pacific Railroad Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Joint Motion To Set Briefing Schedule) (Markel, Aaron) Modified event type on 11/12/2019 (bdb).
November 7, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE of Certificate of Compliance with Rule 65 re: #18 MOTION for Injunction filed by BNSF Railway Company, CSX Transportation, Inc., Grand Trunk Western Railroad Company, Illinois Central Railroad Company, Norfolk Southern Railway Company, The Belt Railway Company of Chicago, The Kansas City Southern Railway Company, Union Pacific Railroad Company (Markel, Aaron)
November 7, 2019 Filing 20 Appendix in Support filed by BNSF Railway Company, CSX Transportation, Inc., Grand Trunk Western Railroad Company, Illinois Central Railroad Company, Norfolk Southern Railway Company, The Belt Railway Company of Chicago, The Kansas City Southern Railway Company, Union Pacific Railroad Company re #19 Brief/Memorandum in Support of Motion, #18 MOTION for Injunction (Attachments: #1 Index to Appendix, #2 Appendix - Part 1 (Pages 1-220), #3 Appendix - Part 2 (Pages 221-472), #4 Appendix - Part 3 (Pages 473-557), #5 Appendix - Part 4 (Pages 558-627)) (Markel, Aaron)
November 7, 2019 Filing 19 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by BNSF Railway Company, CSX Transportation, Inc., Grand Trunk Western Railroad Company, Illinois Central Railroad Company, Norfolk Southern Railway Company, The Belt Railway Company of Chicago, The Kansas City Southern Railway Company, Union Pacific Railroad Company re #18 MOTION for Injunction (Markel, Aaron)
November 7, 2019 Filing 18 PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION filed by BNSF Railway Company, CSX Transportation, Inc., Grand Trunk Western Railroad Company, Illinois Central Railroad Company, Norfolk Southern Railway Company, The Belt Railway Company of Chicago, The Kansas City Southern Railway Company, Union Pacific Railroad Company (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Markel, Aaron) Modified title on 11/8/2019 (ctf).
October 31, 2019 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to International Association of Sheet Metal, Air, Rail and Transportation Workers - Transportation Division ; served on 10/25/2019. (Cawyer, Russell)
October 21, 2019 Filing 16 Summons Issued as to International Association of Sheet Metal, Air, Rail and Transportation Workers - Transportation Division. (tln)
October 21, 2019 Filing 15 Request for Clerk to issue Summons filed by BNSF Railway Company, CSX Transportation, Inc., Grand Trunk Western Railroad Company, Illinois Central Railroad Company, Norfolk Southern Railway Company, The Belt Railway Company of Chicago, The Kansas City Southern Railway Company, Union Pacific Railroad Company. (Cawyer, Russell)
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #11 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Aaron Markel. Important Reminder: Unless excused for cause, an attorney who is not an ECF user must register within 14 days of the date the attorney appears in a case pursuant to LR 5.1(f) and LCrR 49.2(g). (Ordered by Judge Mark Pittman on 10/21/2019) (chmb)(cpb)
October 21, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Braden C Allman on behalf of BNSF Railway Company, CSX Transportation, Inc., Grand Trunk Western Railroad Company, Illinois Central Railroad Company, Norfolk Southern Railway Company, The Belt Railway Company of Chicago, The Kansas City Southern Railway Company, Union Pacific Railroad Company. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Allman, Braden)
October 21, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Russell D Cawyer on behalf of BNSF Railway Company, CSX Transportation, Inc., Grand Trunk Western Railroad Company, Illinois Central Railroad Company, Norfolk Southern Railway Company, The Belt Railway Company of Chicago, The Kansas City Southern Railway Company, Union Pacific Railroad Company. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Cawyer, Russell)
October 16, 2019 Filing 11 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $100; Receipt number 0539-10341961) filed by BNSF Railway Company, CSX Transportation, Inc., Grand Trunk Western Railroad Company, Illinois Central Railroad Company, Norfolk Southern Railway Company, The Belt Railway Company of Chicago, The Kansas City Southern Railway Company, Union Pacific Railroad Company (Markel, Aaron)
October 3, 2019 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by The Belt Railway Company of Chicago identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate CSX Transportation, Inc., Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Norfolk Southern Railway Company, Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Berkshire Hathaway, Inc., Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Canadian National Railway Company, Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate National Indemnity Company, Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate OBH LLC, Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Burlington Northern Santa Fe, LLC, Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate BNSF Railway Company, Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate CSX Corporation, Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Grand Trunk Corporation, Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate North American Railways, Inc., Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Illinois Central Corporation, Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate CN Financial Services, VIII LLC, Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Southern Pacific Rail Corporation, Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Illinois Central Railroad Company, Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Union Pacific Corporation, Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Norfolk Southern Corporation, Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Union Pacific Railroad Company for The Belt Railway Company of Chicago. (Munro, Donald)
October 3, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Union Pacific Railroad Company identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Southern Pacific Rail Corporation, Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Union Pacific Corporation for Union Pacific Railroad Company. (Munro, Donald)
October 3, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Illinois Central Railroad Company identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Canadian National Railway Company, Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Grand Trunk Corporation, Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate North American Railways, Inc., Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Illinois Central Corporation, Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate CN Financial Services, VIII LLC for Illinois Central Railroad Company. (Munro, Donald)
October 3, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Norfolk Southern Railway Company identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Norfolk Southern Corporation for Norfolk Southern Railway Company. (Munro, Donald)
October 3, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Grand Trunk Western Railroad Company identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Canadian National Railway Company, Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Grand Trunk Corporation, Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate North American Railways, Inc. for Grand Trunk Western Railroad Company. (Munro, Donald)
October 3, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by The Kansas City Southern Railway Company identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Kansas City Southern for The Kansas City Southern Railway Company. (Munro, Donald)
October 3, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by CSX Transportation, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate CSX Corporation for CSX Transportation, Inc.. (Munro, Donald)
October 3, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by BNSF Railway Company identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Berkshire Hathaway, Inc., Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate National Indemnity Company, Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate OBH LLC, Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Burlington Northern Santa Fe, LLC for BNSF Railway Company. (Munro, Donald)
October 3, 2019 Filing 2 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. File to: Judge Pittman. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. Attorneys are further reminded that, if necessary, they must comply with Local Rule 83.10(a) within 14 days or risk the possible dismissal of this case without prejudice or without further notice. (tln)
October 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by CSX Transportation, Inc., The Belt Railway Company of Chicago, BNSF Railway Company, The Kansas City Southern Railway Company, Grand Trunk Western Railroad Company, Illinois Central Railroad Company, Norfolk Southern Railway Company, Union Pacific Railroad Company. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-10310582.) Summons(es) not requested at this time. In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (Munro, Donald)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BNSF Railway Company et al v. International Association of Sheet Metal, Air, Rail and Transportation Workers - Transportation Division
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Norfolk Southern Railway Company
Represented By: Aaron S. Markel
Represented By: Donald J Munro
Represented By: Brian M Jorgensen
Represented By: Russell D Cawyer
Represented By: Aaron Samuels Markel
Represented By: Braden C Allman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Union Pacific Railroad Company
Represented By: Aaron S. Markel
Represented By: Donald J Munro
Represented By: Brian M Jorgensen
Represented By: Russell D Cawyer
Represented By: Aaron Samuels Markel
Represented By: Braden C Allman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Belt Railway Company of Chicago
Represented By: Aaron S. Markel
Represented By: Donald J Munro
Represented By: Brian M Jorgensen
Represented By: Russell D Cawyer
Represented By: Aaron Samuels Markel
Represented By: Braden C Allman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BNSF Railway Company
Represented By: Aaron S. Markel
Represented By: Donald J Munro
Represented By: Brian M Jorgensen
Represented By: Russell D Cawyer
Represented By: Aaron Samuels Markel
Represented By: Braden C Allman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Illinois Central Railroad Company
Represented By: Aaron S. Markel
Represented By: Donald J Munro
Represented By: Brian M Jorgensen
Represented By: Russell D Cawyer
Represented By: Aaron Samuels Markel
Represented By: Braden C Allman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Grand Trunk Western Railroad Company
Represented By: Aaron S. Markel
Represented By: Donald J Munro
Represented By: Brian M Jorgensen
Represented By: Russell D Cawyer
Represented By: Aaron Samuels Markel
Represented By: Braden C Allman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CSX Transportation, Inc.
Represented By: Aaron S. Markel
Represented By: Donald J Munro
Represented By: Brian M Jorgensen
Represented By: Russell D Cawyer
Represented By: Aaron Samuels Markel
Represented By: Braden C Allman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Kansas City Southern Railway Company
Represented By: Aaron S. Markel
Represented By: Donald J Munro
Represented By: Brian M Jorgensen
Represented By: Russell D Cawyer
Represented By: Aaron Samuels Markel
Represented By: Braden C Allman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Association of Sheet Metal, Air, Rail and Transportation Workers - Transportation Division
Represented By: Kevin C Brodar
Represented By: Sanford R Denison
Represented By: Shawn M McKinley
Represented By: Erika A Diehl-Gibbons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?