Young v. Unum Provident Corporation
Plaintiff: G Young
Defendant: Unum Provident Corporation
Case Number: 4:2019cv00964
Filed: November 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Reed C O'Connor
Nature of Suit: Labor: Employee Retirement Income Security Act (ERISA)
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 6, 2020 Civil Case Terminated per #7 Stipulation of Dismissal. (edm)
January 6, 2020 Filing 7 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE by Unum Provident Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Lynch, Dennis)
December 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: The parties are therefore directed to file the appropriate dismissal papers a stipulation of dismissal under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1) (A)(ii), or an agreed motion with the corresponding proposed order with the Clerk's Office on or before January 16, 2020. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 12/12/2019) (skg)
December 11, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of SETTLEMENT filed by Unum Provident Corporation (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Lynch, Dennis)
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REQUIRING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND REPORT FOR CONTENTS OF SCHEDULING ORDER: Joint report due by 12/16/2019. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 11/18/2019) (skg)
November 15, 2019 Filing 3 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. File to: Judge O Connor. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. Attorneys are further reminded that, if necessary, they must comply with Local Rule 83.10(a) within 14 days or risk the possible dismissal of this case without prejudice or without further notice. (tln)
November 15, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Unum Provident Corporation identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Unum Group for Unum Provident Corporation. (Lynch, Dennis)
November 15, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from County Court at Law No. 1 of Tarrant County, Texas, case number 2019-007950-1 filed by Unum Provident Corporation. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0539-10412697) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) C, #4 Exhibit(s) D, #5 Cover Sheet, #6 Cover Sheet Supplement) (Lynch, Dennis)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Young v. Unum Provident Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: G Young
Represented By: Kelli Larsen Walter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unum Provident Corporation
Represented By: Dennis M Lynch
Represented By: Cameron Elliot Jean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?