Bollinger Industries Inc v. Walter R Tucker Enterprises Ltd
Plaintiff: Bollinger Industries Inc., and Bollinger Industries Inc
Defendant: Mark Tucker, Walter R. Tucker Enterprises, LTD and Walter R Tucker Enterprises Ltd
Case Number: 4:2019cv01044
Filed: December 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Reed C O'Connor
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 29, 2020 Case transferred from NDTX has been opened in United States District Court for the Northern District of New York Binghamton Division Division as case number 3:20-cv-00095. (wxc)
January 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Order Transferring to Another District: Case transferred to Binghamton Division of Northern District of New York. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 1/27/2020) (skg)
January 27, 2020 Interdistrict Transfer to United States District Court for the Northern District of New York, Binghamton Division; notice sent via email. All documents available electronically. If receiving court cannot upload, documents are available from PACER (record does not contain restricted documents). Counsel advised to file future documents in United States District Court for the Northern District of New York, Binghamton Division. (skg)
January 24, 2020 Filing 15 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Bollinger Industries Inc.,. Amendment to #11 Supplemental Document. (Plaintiff's Amended Supplementary Document Regarding Defendants' Motion to Transfer Venue). (Billingsley, James)
January 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SCHEDULING ORDER: Joinder of Parties due by 3/23/2020. Amended Pleadings due by 3/23/2020. Motions due by 11/30/2020. Deadline for mediation is on or before 9/30/2020. Discovery due by 10/30/2020. Pretrial Order due by 3/4/2021. This case is set for trial on this Court's four-week docket beginning March 29, 2021 in US Courthouse, Courtroom 2nd Floor, 501 W. 10th St. Fort Worth, TX 76102-3673 before Judge Reed C. O'Connor. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 1/22/2020) (skg)
January 21, 2020 Filing 13 Joint STATUS REPORT Regarding Contents of Scheduling Order filed by Bollinger Industries Inc.,. (Billingsley, James)
January 16, 2020 Filing 12 Amended ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) filed by Walter R. Tucker Enterprises, LTD, Mark Tucker Attorneys are further reminded that, if necessary, they must comply with Local Rule 83.10(a) within 14 days or risk the possible dismissal of this case without prejudice or without further notice., COUNTERCLAIM against Bollinger Industries Inc., filed by Walter R. Tucker Enterprises, LTD, Mark Tucker (Breaux, Ronald)
January 7, 2020 Filing 11 Supplemental Document by Bollinger Industries Inc., as to #8 MOTION to Transfer Case out of District/Division (Plaintiff's Supplementary Document Regarding Defendants' Motion to Transfer Venue). (Billingsley, James)
January 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: Accordingly, it is ORDERED that Plaintiff file a supplementary document stating their opposition or lack thereof to Defendants' Motion to Transfer on or before January 7, 2020. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 1/6/2020) (skg)
January 3, 2020 Filing 9 Appendix in Support filed by Mark Tucker, Walter R. Tucker Enterprises, LTD re #8 MOTION to Transfer Case out of District/Division (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Benjamin G. Goodman, #2 Exhibit(s) A, #3 Exhibit(s) B, #4 Exhibit(s) C, #5 Exhibit(s) D) (Breaux, Ronald)
January 3, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Transfer Case out of District/Division filed by Mark Tucker, Walter R. Tucker Enterprises, LTD with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Breaux, Ronald)
December 26, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) filed by Mark Tucker, Walter R. Tucker Enterprises, LTD Attorneys are further reminded that, if necessary, they must comply with Local Rule 83.10(a) within 14 days or risk the possible dismissal of this case without prejudice or without further notice. (Breaux, Ronald)
December 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REQUIRING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND REPORT FOR CONTENTS OF SCHEDULING ORDER: Joint Report due by 1/21/2020. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 12/23/2019) (trt)
December 23, 2019 Filing 5 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Walter R. Tucker Enterprises, LTD, Mark Tucker. Amendment to #1 Notice of Removal,,,,,,,. . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) C, #4 Exhibit(s) D, #5 Exhibit(s) E, #6 Cover Sheet, #7 Cover Sheet Supplement, #8 State Court Docket, #9 Index to State Court Pleadings, #10 Exhibit(s) 1, #11 Exhibit(s) 2, #12 Exhibit(s) 3, #13 Exhibit(s) 4, #14 Exhibit(s) 5, #15 Exhibit(s) 6, #16 Exhibit(s) 7, #17 Exhibit(s) 8, #18 Exhibit(s) 9, #19 Exhibit(s) 10, #20 Exhibit(s) 11, #21 Exhibit(s) 12, #22 Exhibit(s) 13, #23 Exhibit(s) 14, #24 Exhibit(s) 15, #25 Exhibit(s) 16, #26 Exhibit(s) 17, #27 Exhibit(s) 18, #28 Exhibit(s) 19, #29 Exhibit(s) 20, #30 Exhibit(s) 21, #31 Exhibit(s) 22, #32 Exhibit(s) 23, #33 Exhibit(s) 24, #34 Exhibit(s) 25) (Breaux, Ronald)
December 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: Defendant must file an amended notice of removal specifically addressing the pleading defects identified by the Court by January 2, 2020. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 12/19/2019) (skg)
December 18, 2019 Filing 3 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. File to: Judge O Connor. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. Attorneys are further reminded that, if necessary, they must comply with Local Rule 83.10(a) within 14 days or risk the possible dismissal of this case without prejudice or without further notice. (wxc)
December 18, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Mark Tucker, Walter R. Tucker Enterprises, Ltd., d.b.a. E-Z Red Company. (Breaux, Ronald)
December 18, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 67th Judicial District Court, Tarrant County, Texas, case number 067-292097-17 filed by Walter R. Tucker Enterprises, Ltd., d.b.a. E-Z Red Company, Mark Tucker. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0539-10488754) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) C, #4 Exhibit(s) D, #5 Exhibit(s) E, #6 Cover Sheet, #7 Cover Sheet Supplement, #8 State Court Docket, #9 Index of State Court Pleadings, #10 Exhibit(s) 1, #11 Exhibit(s) 2, #12 Exhibit(s) 3, #13 Exhibit(s) 4, #14 Exhibit(s) 5, #15 Exhibit(s) 6, #16 Exhibit(s) 7, #17 Exhibit(s) 8, #18 Exhibit(s) 9, #19 Exhibit(s) 10, #20 Exhibit(s) 11, #21 Exhibit(s) 12, #22 Exhibit(s) 13, #23 Exhibit(s) 14, #24 Exhibit(s) 15, #25 Exhibit(s) 16, #26 Exhibit(s) 17, #27 Exhibit(s) 18, #28 Exhibit(s) 19, #29 Exhibit(s) 20, #30 Exhibit(s) 21, #31 Exhibit(s) 22, #32 Exhibit(s) 23, #33 Exhibit(s) 24, #34 Exhibit(s) 25) (Breaux, Ronald)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bollinger Industries Inc v. Walter R Tucker Enterprises Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Tucker
Represented By: Ronald W Breaux
Represented By: Benjamin G Goodman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walter R. Tucker Enterprises, LTD
Represented By: Ronald W Breaux
Represented By: Benjamin G Goodman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walter R Tucker Enterprises Ltd
Represented By: Ronald W Breaux
Represented By: Benjamin G Goodman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bollinger Industries Inc.,
Represented By: James H Billingsley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bollinger Industries Inc
Represented By: James H Billingsley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?