United States of America v. Factor et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Kimberley Susan Campbell Factor, Kimberly Ann Krauklis, Mary Virginia Ray Campbell, University Federal Credit Union, Steven Morgan Krauklis, Abraham Michael Factor and Abraham "Abe" Michael Factor
Case Number: 4:2020cv00183
Filed: February 26, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Reed C O'Connor
Nature of Suit: Federal Tax Suits: Taxes (US Plaintiff or Defendant)
Cause of Action: 26 U.S.C. ยง 7401
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 24, 2020 Filing 26 NOTICE of Non-Opposition re: #25 Order, filed by Kimberly Ann Krauklis, Steven Morgan Krauklis, University Federal Credit Union (Allman, Allison)
April 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 NOTICE: The undersigned knows, professionally, Defendants Abraham Michael Factor and Kimberley Susan Campbell Factor (the Factors). Additionally, during the summer of 2015 a son of the Factors interned for the undersigned. Any party believing this is cause for recusal should file a brief in support which will be considered on an expedited basis. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 4/23/2020) (pef)
April 23, 2020 *** #24 Order withdrawn. Magistrate Judge Hal R. Ray, Jr no longer referred to case. (chmb)
April 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ***WITHDRAWN BY CHAMBERS*** ORDER: This case is hereby referred to Magistrate Judge Ray for pretrial management. All non-dispositive motions are referred to the magistrate judge for determination according to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a). All case dispositive motions are referred to the magistrate judge for recommendation according to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(b)(1). All other pretrial matters, including scheduling and alternative dispute resolution are referred to the magistrate judge for appropriate action consistent with applicable law. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 4/22/2020) (pef) Modified on 4/23/2020 (chmb).
April 22, 2020 Filing 23 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jeffrey M Glassman on behalf of Abraham "Abe" Michael Factor, Kimberley Susan Campbell Factor. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Glassman, Jeffrey)
April 22, 2020 Filing 22 Joint STATUS REPORT Joint Report filed by United States of America. (Notinger, Ramona)
April 16, 2020 Filing 21 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Kimberly Ann Krauklis, Steven Morgan Krauklis, University Federal Credit Union. (Allman, Allison)
April 16, 2020 Filing 20 RESPONSE AND OBJECTION filed by United States of America re: #12 MOTION to Dismiss (Notinger, Ramona)
April 15, 2020 Filing 19 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Abraham "Abe" Michael Factor, Kimberley Susan Campbell Factor. (Wood, Mary)
April 15, 2020 Filing 18 ANSWER to #6 Amended Complaint,, with Jury Demand filed by Abraham "Abe" Michael Factor, Kimberley Susan Campbell Factor. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Attorneys are further reminded that, if necessary, they must comply with Local Rule 83.10(a) within 14 days or risk the possible dismissal of this case without prejudice or without further notice. (Wood, Mary)
April 15, 2020 Filing 17 ANSWER to #6 Amended Complaint,, filed by Kimberly Ann Krauklis, Steven Morgan Krauklis, University Federal Credit Union. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Attorneys are further reminded that, if necessary, they must comply with Local Rule 83.10(a) within 14 days or risk the possible dismissal of this case without prejudice or without further notice. (Allman, Allison)
March 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER: Before the Court is Defendant Abraham Michael Factor and Kimberley Susan Campbell Factor's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer (Motion) (ECF No. #15 ), filed March 27, 2020. In the Motion, Defendants request the deadline to file an Answer be extended up to and including April 15, 2020. Having considered the unopposed Motion, the Court finds that it should be and is hereby GRANTED. Accordingly, Defendants may file an Answer on or before April 15, 2020. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 3/30/2020) (pef)
March 27, 2020 Filing 15 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Abraham "Abe" Michael Factor, Kimberley Susan Campbell Factor Attorney Mary Elizabeth Wood added to party Abraham "Abe" Michael Factor(pty:dft), Attorney Mary Elizabeth Wood added to party Kimberley Susan Campbell Factor(pty:dft) (Wood, Mary)
March 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER REQUIRING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND REPORT FOR CONTENTS OF SCHEDULING ORDER: The Joint Report, shall be filed on or before April 22, 2020. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 3/25/2020) (pef)
March 24, 2020 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Mary Virginia Ray Campbell. (McAdoo, Mark)
March 24, 2020 Filing 12 ANSWER to #6 Amended Complaint, MOTION to Dismiss filed by Mary Virginia Ray Campbell. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Attorneys are further reminded that, if necessary, they must comply with Local Rule 83.10(a) within 14 days or risk the possible dismissal of this case without prejudice or without further notice.Attorney Mark McAdoo added to party Mary Virginia Ray Campbell(pty:dft) (McAdoo, Mark) Modified event and docket text on 3/26/2020 (pef).
March 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint. Kimberly Ann Krauklis answer due 4/15/2020; Steven Morgan Krauklis answer due 4/15/2020; University Federal Credit Union answer due 4/15/2020. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 3/19/2020) (chmb)
March 18, 2020 Filing 10 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Kimberly Ann Krauklis, Steven Morgan Krauklis, University Federal Credit Union with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Allison Allman added to party Kimberly Ann Krauklis(pty:dft), Attorney Allison Allman added to party Steven Morgan Krauklis(pty:dft), Attorney Allison Allman added to party University Federal Credit Union(pty:dft) (Allman, Allison)
March 13, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Kimberly Ann Krauklis ; served on 3/6/2020. (Notinger, Ramona)
March 12, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Mary Virginia Ray Campbell ; served on 3/11/2020; Steven Morgan Krauklis ; served on 3/6/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service Steven Krauklis) (Notinger, Ramona)
March 5, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to University Federal Credit Union ; served on 3/4/2020. (Notinger, Ramona)
February 27, 2020 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT United States' Amended Complaint against All Defendants filed by United States of America. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Notinger, Ramona)
February 27, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (wrb)
February 27, 2020 Filing 4 New Case Notes: A filing fee is not due for this case. File to: Judge O Connor. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. Attorneys are further reminded that, if necessary, they must comply with Local Rule 83.10(a) within 14 days or risk the possible dismissal of this case without prejudice or without further notice. (wrb)
February 26, 2020 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by United States of America. (Notinger, Ramona)
February 26, 2020 Filing 2 Request for Clerk to issue Summonses filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Summons - Kimberley Susan Campbell Factor a_k_a Kimberley Susan Campbell, #2 Summons - Steven Morgan Krauklis, #3 Summons - Kimberly Ann Krauklis, #4 Summons - University Federal Credit Union, #5 Summons - Mary Virginia Ray Campbell) (Notinger, Ramona)
February 26, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by United States of America. (Filer fee note- Filed by the USA) Plaintiff will submit summons(es) for issuance. In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (Notinger, Ramona)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Factor et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kimberley Susan Campbell Factor
Represented By: Josh O Ungerman
Represented By: Mary Elizabeth Wood
Represented By: Jeffrey M Glassman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kimberly Ann Krauklis
Represented By: Scott A Wheatley
Represented By: Mark Gregory Torabi
Represented By: Allison Allman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Virginia Ray Campbell
Represented By: Mark McAdoo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: University Federal Credit Union
Represented By: Scott A Wheatley
Represented By: Allison Allman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Morgan Krauklis
Represented By: Scott A Wheatley
Represented By: Mark Gregory Torabi
Represented By: Allison Allman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abraham Michael Factor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abraham "Abe" Michael Factor
Represented By: Josh O Ungerman
Represented By: Mary Elizabeth Wood
Represented By: Jeffrey M Glassman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Ramona S Notinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?