Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company v. P.C. Contractors, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company
Defendant: P.C. Contractors, LLC, Reytech Services, LLC and John Douglas Chase patterson
Case Number: 4:2020cv00211
Filed: March 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: John McBryde
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 FINAL JUDGMENT AS TO CERTAIN DEFENDANTS...The court ORDERS, ADJUDGES, and DECREES that plaintiff, Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company, have and recover from defendants P.C. Contractors, LLC, and John Douglas Chase Patterson, jointly and severally, the sum of $1,901,611.46 plus post-judgment interest thereon at the rate of 0.17%, computed daily on the unpaid balance from the date of entry of this judgment until the full amount of the judgment is paid, and compounded annually.The court further ORDERS that plaintiff have and recover its costs of court from said defendants, jointly and severally. P.C. Contractors, LLC and John Douglas Chase Patterson terminated. (Ordered by Senior Judge John McBryde on 5/1/2020) (wrb)
May 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting #26 Motion for Default Judgment. Plaintiff have and recover from LLC and Patterson, jointly and severally, the sum of $1,901,611.46 plus post-judgment interest thereon at the rate of 0.17%, computed daily on the unpaid balance from the date of entry of this judgment until the full amount of the judgment is paid, and compounded annually.The court further ORDERS that plaintiff have and recover its costs of court from LLC and Patterson, jointly and severally. The court determines that there is no just reason for delay in, and hereby directs, entry of final judgment as to plaintiff's claims against LLC and Patterson. (Ordered by Senior Judge John McBryde on 5/1/2020) (wrb)
May 1, 2020 Filing 26 MOTION for Default Judgment against P.C. Contractors, LLC, John Douglas Chase Patterson filed by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Ex. A, #2 Exhibit(s) Ex. A-1, #3 Exhibit(s) Ex. A-2, #4 Exhibit(s) Ex. B, #5 Proposed Order proposed order) (Cannon, Steven)
April 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 Continuation of Partial Suspension of Standing Order of 1/15/19 - The directive in paragraph 1 requiring that no document be filed by electronic means, and the directive in paragraph 2 requiring that paper copies of electronically filed documents be delivered to the clerk for filing, are suspended until 6/8/2020. (Ordered by Senior Judge John McBryde on 4/30/2020) (Order has been served on registered users of the ECF system)(lrl)
April 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 STATUS REPORT ORDER: Status Report due by 5/25/2020 4pm (Ordered by Senior Judge John McBryde on 4/23/2020) (wrb)
April 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER denying #17 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Ordered by Senior Judge John McBryde on 4/21/2020) (wrb)
April 21, 2020 Filing 22 RESPONSE filed by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company re: #17 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Cannon, Steven)
April 21, 2020 Filing 21 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to P.C. Contractors, LLC, John Douglas Chase Patterson (wrb)
April 21, 2020 Filing 20 Request for Clerk to issue Clerk's Entry of Default filed by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Ex. A, #2 Proposed Order proposed Entry of Default) (Cannon, Steven)
April 1, 2020 Filing 19 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Reytech Services, LLC. (Beshara, Lance)
April 1, 2020 Filing 18 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Reytech Services, LLC. (Beshara, Lance)
March 31, 2020 Filing 17 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Reytech Services, LLC Attorney Lance H Beshara added to party Reytech Services, LLC(pty:dft) (Beshara, Lance)
March 23, 2020 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Reytech Services, LLC.; served on 3/11/20 (wxc)
March 23, 2020 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to John Douglas Chase Patterson ; served on 3/16/2020. (Dry, Ryan)
March 23, 2020 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Reytech Services, LLC ; served on 3/11/2020. (Dry, Ryan)
March 19, 2020 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to P.C. Contractors, LLC ; served on 3/10/2020 by private process server. (wrb)
March 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Partial Suspension of Standing Order of 1/15/19 - The directive in paragraph 1 requiring that no document be filed by electronic means, and the directive in paragraph 2 requiring that paper copies of electronically filed documents be delivered to the clerk for filing, are suspended until 5/1/2020. (Ordered by Senior Judge John McBryde on 3/19/2020) (Order has been served on registered users of the ECF system)(lrl)
March 18, 2020 Filing 11 Received Original and Judge's Copies of Case Initiating Documents pursuant to standing order re: #4 Notice of Attorney Appearance, #2 Cert. Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement, #1 Complaint,,,, filed by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Additional Page(s), #2 Additional Page(s)) (wrb)
March 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Order Unfiling #9 Notice (Other), filed by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company due to the following deficiency: documents signed by law firm. re: #9 Notice (Other), (Ordered by Senior Judge John McBryde on 3/16/2020) (wrb)
March 16, 2020 Filing 9 [Unfiled per Order of 3/16/20] Received Original and Judge's copy of case initiating documents pursuant to standing order re: #4 Notice of Attorney Appearance, #2 Cert. Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement, #1 Complaint,,,, filed by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Additional Page(s) NOA, #2 Additional Page(s) COA) (wrb) Modified on 3/17/2020 (wrb).
March 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: by March 16 2020, plaintiff file paper copies of its complaint and certificate of interested persons in accordance with the standing order issued in this case. (Ordered by Senior Judge John McBryde on 3/12/2020) (wrb)
March 6, 2020 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to P.C. Contractors, LLC, John Douglas Chase Patterson, Reytech Services, LLC. (wrb)
March 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Standing ORDER Concerning Paper Filing in Cases Assigned to District Judge John McBryde...see order for specifics. (Ordered by Senior Judge John McBryde on 3/6/2020) (wrb)
March 6, 2020 Filing 5 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. File to Judge McBryde. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (wrb)
March 5, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ryan D Dry for Steven K. Cannon on behalf of Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. (Dry, Ryan)
March 5, 2020 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to issue Summons filed by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Additional Page(s), #2 Additional Page(s)) (Dry, Ryan)
March 5, 2020 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Tokio Marine Holdings, Inc. for Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. (Dry, Ryan)
March 5, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-10678506) Plaintiff will submit summons(es) for issuance. In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Cover Sheet) (Dry, Ryan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company v. P.C. Contractors, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P.C. Contractors, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reytech Services, LLC
Represented By: Lance H Beshara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Douglas Chase patterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company
Represented By: Ryan D Dry
Represented By: Steven K Cannon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?