Rapp v. Sine et al
Plaintiff: Phil Rapp
Defendant: Tim Sine and Sine Ranch, LLC
Not Classified By Court: ADR Provider
Case Number: 4:2020cv00230
Filed: March 12, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Mark Pittman
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 11, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Phil Rapp with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit(s)) (Davis, Whitney)
April 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING ORDER: This case is set for trial on this Court's four-week docket before Judge Mark Pittman. Joinder of Parties due by 6/5/2020. Amended Pleadings due by 6/5/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 3/22/2021. In accordance with the Court's Civil Justice Expense and Delay Reduction Plan, the Court hereby REFERS this case to mediation and APPOINTS Mike Henry as the mediator in this case. Deadline for mediation is on or before 1/20/2021. Discovery due by 2/19/2021. Pretrial Material/Order due by 6/24/2021. (see order) (Ordered by Judge Mark Pittman on 4/6/2020) (tln)
April 3, 2020 Filing 10 JOINT REPORT FOR CONTENTS OF SCHEDULING ORDER filed by Tim Sine, Sine Ranch, LLC. (Richmond, William)
March 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #7 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Whitney A. Davis. Important Reminder: Unless excused for cause, an attorney who is not an ECF user must register within 14 days of the date the attorney appears in a case pursuant to LR 5.1(f) and LCrR 49.2(g). (Ordered by Judge Mark Pittman on 3/30/2020) (tln)
March 27, 2020 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Phil Rapp. (Davis, Whitney)
March 27, 2020 Filing 7 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $100; Receipt number 0539-10732458) filed by Phil Rapp (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order). Party Phil Rapp d/b/a Rapp Ranch added. (Davis, Whitney)
March 23, 2020 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Tim Sine, Sine Ranch, LLC. (Richmond, William)
March 20, 2020 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:5. Fri Mar 20 12:29:27 CDT 2020 (crt)
March 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REQUIRING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND REPORT FOR CONTENTS OF SCHEDULING ORDER: The Joint Report shall be filed on or before April 3, 2020. (Ordered by Judge Mark Pittman on 3/20/2020) (tln)
March 19, 2020 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint filed by Tim Sine, Sine Ranch, LLC. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Attorneys are further reminded that, if necessary, they must comply with Local Rule 83.10(a) within 14 days or risk the possible dismissal of this case without prejudice or without further notice. (Dimitt, Steven)
March 12, 2020 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:3. Thu Mar 12 14:49:15 CDT 2020 (crt)
March 12, 2020 Filing 3 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. File to: Judge Pittman. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. Attorneys are further reminded that, if necessary, they must comply with Local Rule 83.10(a) within 14 days or risk the possible dismissal of this case without prejudice or without further notice. (tln)
March 12, 2020 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Tim Sine, Sine Ranch, LLC. (Richmond, William)
March 12, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH JURY DEMAND from 43rd District Court, Parker County, case number CV19-2015 filed by Tim Sine, Sine Ranch, LLC. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0539-10697006) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Cover Sheet Supplement) (Richmond, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rapp v. Sine et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tim Sine
Represented By: William S Richmond
Represented By: Steven W Dimitt
Represented By: Laura Elizabeth Brandt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sine Ranch, LLC
Represented By: William S Richmond
Represented By: Steven W Dimitt
Represented By: Laura Elizabeth Brandt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phil Rapp
Represented By: Whitney A. Davis
Represented By: Whitney Aaron Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: ADR Provider
Represented By: Michael J Henry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?