Kelley et al v. Azar II et al
Plaintiff: John Kelley, Kelley Orthodontics, Joel Starnes and Braidwood Management Inc.
Defendant: Steven T. Mnuchin, Alex M. Azar II, Eugene Scalia and United States of America
Case Number: 4:2020cv00283
Filed: March 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Reed C O'Connor
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: Before the Court is Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer (Motion) (ECF No. #8 ), filed May 20, 2020. Having considered the unopposed Motion, the Court finds that it should be and is hereby GRANTED. It is hereby ORDERED that Defendants may respond to Plaintiff's Complaint on or before June 29, 2020. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 5/20/2020) (pef)
May 20, 2020 Filing 8 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Alex M. Azar II, Steven T. Mnuchin, Eugene Scalia, United States of America with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Von Bokern-DOJ, Jordan)
May 19, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Christopher M Lynch on behalf of Alex M. Azar II, Steven T. Mnuchin, Eugene Scalia, United States of America. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Lynch, Christopher)
May 19, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jordan Landrum Von Bokern-DOJ on behalf of Alex M. Azar II, Steven T. Mnuchin, Eugene Scalia, United States of America. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Von Bokern-DOJ, Jordan)
April 14, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed: U.S. Attorney served on 04/03/2020 on behalf of all defendants; U.S. Attorney General served on 04/07/2020 on behalf of all defendants. (Fillmore, H) Modified docket text on 4/15/2020 (pef).
March 30, 2020 Filing 4 Summons issued as to Alex M. Azar II, Steven T. Mnuchin, Eugene Scalia, United States of America, U.S. Attorney, and U.S. Attorney General. (pef)
March 29, 2020 Filing 3 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. File to: Judge O'Connor. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. Attorneys are further reminded that, if necessary, they must comply with Local Rule 83.10(a) within 14 days or risk the possible dismissal of this case without prejudice or without further notice. (pef)
March 29, 2020 Case Reassigned to Judge Reed C. O'Connor. Senior Judge John McBryde no longer assigned to the case. (pef)
March 29, 2020 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Braidwood Management Inc., John Kelley, Kelley Orthodontics, Joel Starnes. (Mitchell, Jonathan)
March 29, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Kelley Orthodontics, Joel Starnes, Braidwood Management Inc., John Kelley. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-10733398) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Exhibit(s), #3 Exhibit(s), #4 Exhibit(s), #5 Exhibit(s), #6 Exhibit(s), #7 Cover Sheet) (Mitchell, Jonathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kelley et al v. Azar II et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Kelley
Represented By: Jonathan F Mitchell
Represented By: H Dustin Fillmore, III
Represented By: Charles W Fillmore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelley Orthodontics
Represented By: Jonathan F Mitchell
Represented By: H Dustin Fillmore, III
Represented By: Charles W Fillmore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joel Starnes
Represented By: Jonathan F Mitchell
Represented By: H Dustin Fillmore, III
Represented By: Charles W Fillmore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Braidwood Management Inc.
Represented By: Jonathan F Mitchell
Represented By: H Dustin Fillmore, III
Represented By: Charles W Fillmore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven T. Mnuchin
Represented By: Christopher M Lynch
Represented By: Brian Walters Stoltz-DOJ
Represented By: Jordan Landrum Von Bokern-DOJ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alex M. Azar II
Represented By: Christopher M Lynch
Represented By: Brian Walters Stoltz-DOJ
Represented By: Jordan Landrum Von Bokern-DOJ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eugene Scalia
Represented By: Christopher M Lynch
Represented By: Brian Walters Stoltz-DOJ
Represented By: Jordan Landrum Von Bokern-DOJ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Christopher M Lynch
Represented By: Brian Walters Stoltz-DOJ
Represented By: Jordan Landrum Von Bokern-DOJ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?