McGaugh v. Griffin et al
Plaintiff: Robert W. McGaugh
Defendant: FNU Williams, FNU Porter, FNU Stripland, FNU Kellogg, Sheriff FNU Coates, FNU Harris, FNU Goldberg, FNU Bolen, FNU Fanning, FNU Bar, FNU Clayton, FNU Southerland, FNU Robinson, FNU Yochem, FNU Bright, FNU Powers, FNU Dunbar, FNU Rodrigues, FNU Griffin and FNU Moore
Case Number: 4:2020cv00323
Filed: April 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: John McBryde
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Pet/Other: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER: The court ORDERS that plaintiff's #22 motion for extension of time be, and is hereby, granted, and plaintiff be, and is hereby, granted an extension of time until June 30, 2020, in which to file his amended complaint. (Ordered by Senior Judge John McBryde on 6/2/2020) (pef)
June 2, 2020 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:24. Tue Jun 2 15:40:44 CDT 2020 (crt)
May 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 Continuation of Partial Suspension of Standing Order of 1/15/19 - The directive in paragraph 1 requiring that no document be filed by electronic means, and the directive in paragraph 2 requiring that paper copies of electronically filed documents be delivered to the clerk for filing, are suspended until 8/31/2020. (Ordered by Senior Judge John McBryde on 5/29/2020) (ali)
May 29, 2020 Filing 23 AMENDED COMPLAINT against FNU Bolen, FNU Bright, FNU Clayton, FNU Coates, FNU Dunbar, FNU Fanning, FNU Goldberg, FNU Griffin, FNU Harris, FNU Kellogg, FNU Moore, FNU Porter, FNU Powers, FNU Robinson, FNU Rodrigues, FNU Southerland, FNU Stripland, FNU Williams, FNU Yochem filed by Robert W. McGaugh. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (pef)
May 28, 2020 Filing 22 Motion for Extension of Time to File Amended Complaint filed by Robert W. McGaugh. (pef)
May 18, 2020 Filing 20 Claim 12 filed by Robert W. McGaugh. (pef)
May 14, 2020 Filing 19 Claims Signature Page filed by Robert W. McGaugh. (pef)
May 11, 2020 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:18. Mon May 11 09:22:31 CDT 2020 (crt)
May 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER: The deadline for filing an amended complaint remains June 1, 2020. The court admonishes plaintiff not to file any further documents until he has achieved what he believes is a satisfactory amended complaint. The court does not intend to deal with plaintiff's claims on a piecemeal fashion. He is to submit one document that constitutes his amended complaint. Extraneous materials will not be considered. (Ordered by Senior Judge John McBryde on 5/8/2020) (pef)
May 8, 2020 Filing 17 Additional Attachment (Claim 10) to #16 Amended Complaint, by Plaintiff Robert W. McGaugh. (pef)
May 7, 2020 Filing 16 AMENDED COMPLAINT against FNU Bar, FNU Bolen, FNU Bright, FNU Clayton, FNU Coates, FNU Dunbar, FNU Fanning, FNU Goldberg, FNU Griffin, FNU Harris, FNU Kellogg, FNU Moore, FNU Porter, FNU Powers, FNU Robinson, FNU Rodrigues, FNU Southerland, FNU Stripland, FNU Williams, FNU Yochem filed by Robert W. McGaugh. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (pef)
May 7, 2020 Filing 15 Correspondence to the Court filed by Robert W. McGaugh. (pef)
May 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: On April 30, 2020, the clerk received #13 correspondence from plaintiff, Robert W. McGaugh, in response to the court's order of April 22, requiring plaintiff to file an amended complaint. Plaintiff asks for more time to comply. The court finds that the request should be granted. However, the court cautions plaintiff that requests for relief should be made through properly filed motions and not correspondence. The court ORDERS that plaintiff be, and is hereby, granted an extension of time until June 1, 2020, in which to file his amended complaint in compliance with the court's April 22, 2020 order. (Ordered by Senior Judge John McBryde on 5/1/2020) (pef)
May 1, 2020 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:14. Fri May 1 12:51:08 CDT 2020 (crt)
April 30, 2020 Filing 13 Motion for Extension of Time to File pleading re: #11 filed by Robert W. McGaugh. (pef)
April 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Continuation of Partial Suspension of Standing Order of 1/15/19 - The directive in paragraph 1 requiring that no document be filed by electronic means, and the directive in paragraph 2 requiring that paper copies of electronically filed documents be delivered to the clerk for filing, are suspended until 6/8/2020. (Ordered by Senior Judge John McBryde on 4/30/2020) (Order has been served on registered users of the ECF system)(lrl)
April 23, 2020 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:11. Thu Apr 23 10:04:15 CDT 2020 (crt)
April 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: The court ORDERS that, by May 8, 2020, plaintiff file an amended complaint stating with particularity all the material facts on which he contends he will establish his right to recover against defendant. Failure to comply with this order in any respect may lead to the dismissal of plaintiff's claims for want of prosecution. (Ordered by Senior Judge John McBryde on 4/22/2020) (pef)
April 22, 2020 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:10. Wed Apr 22 09:07:07 CDT 2020 (crt)
April 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER WITHHOLDING ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS: The court ORDERS that issuance of process will be withheld until completion of screening of the case under 28 U.S.C. 1915A, as shown by further Court order. (Ordered by Senior Judge John McBryde on 4/21/2020) (pef)
April 20, 2020 Filing 9 Notice Regarding Filing Fee filed by Robert W. McGaugh. (pef)
April 20, 2020 Filing 8 Certificate of Inmate Trust Account by Robert W. McGaugh TDCJ #111651. (pef)
April 20, 2020 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT against FNU Bar, FNU Bolen, FNU Bright, FNU Clayton, FNU Coates, FNU Dunbar, FNU Fanning, FNU Goldberg, FNU Griffin, FNU Harris, FNU Kellogg, FNU Moore, FNU Porter, FNU Powers, FNU Robinson, FNU Rodrigues, FNU Southerland, FNU Stripland, FNU Williams, FNU Yochem filed by Robert W. McGaugh. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (pef)
April 9, 2020 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:6. Thu Apr 9 09:36:42 CDT 2020 (crt)
April 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER AND NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY: Robert W. McGaugh must address the following deficiency: A certificate of inmate trust account. Failure to submit the required trust account statement within thirty (30) days may result in the dismissal of Plaintiff's case without further notice for lack of prosecution. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(b). Deadline to cure the deficiency is 30 days. A true copy of this order shall be mailed to Plaintiff. No further process shall issue except upon order of the Court. A form Certificate of Inmate Trust Account shall be mailed to Plaintiff for completion and return to the clerk of Court. (Ordered by Senior Judge John McBryde on 4/8/2020) (pef)
April 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Standing ORDER Concerning Paper Filing in Cases Assigned to District Judge John McBryde...see order for specifics. Partial Suspension of Standing Order of 1/15/19 - The directive in paragraph 1 requiring that no document be filed by electronic means, and the directive in paragraph 2 requiring that paper copies of electronically filed documents be delivered to the clerk for filing, are suspended until 5/1/2020. (Ordered by Senior Judge John McBryde on 4/8/2020) (Attachments: #1 Additional Page(s)) (pef)
April 8, 2020 Filing 4 Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party. (pef)
April 8, 2020 Filing 3 New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. No prior sanctions found. (For court use only - links to the #national and #circuit indexes.) File to staff attorney DK. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (pef)
April 8, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Robert W. McGaugh. (pef)
April 8, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against FNU Bar, FNU Bolen, FNU Bright, FNU Clayton, FNU Coates, FNU Dunbar, FNU Fanning, FNU Goldberg, FNU Griffin, FNU Harris, FNU Kellogg, FNU Moore, FNU Porter, FNU Powers, FNU Robinson, FNU Rodrigues, FNU Southerland, FNU Stripland, FNU Williams, FNU Yochem filed by Robert W. McGaugh. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (pef)
April 8, 2020 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:3, 4, 5. Wed Apr 8 14:52:53 CDT 2020 (crt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McGaugh v. Griffin et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU Porter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU Stripland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU Kellogg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheriff FNU Coates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU Goldberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU Bolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU Fanning
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU Bar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU Clayton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU Southerland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU Yochem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU Bright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU Powers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU Dunbar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU Rodrigues
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU Griffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert W. McGaugh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?