Gaff v. MSNI Advantage, LP et al
Plaintiff: Jackie Gaff and Jackie Goff
Defendant: Karissa Happe Jones, Krissie, Main Street Asset Solutions, Inc., MSNI Advantage, LP, Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, Residential Funding Corporation, LLC, JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A., PHH Corporation, Sebring Capital Partners, LP, Ronald Happe, Tyler Happe, GMAC Residential Capital Corporation, GMAC Mortgage, LLC, Ally Financial, Inc., Homecomings Financial, LLC, PHH Mortgage Corporation, Nealmikelance Corporation, Main Street Associates, Inc., Residential Capital, LLC, GMAC Residential Funding Corporation, LLC, U.S. Bank National Association, Bank of America, N.A., Ocwen Financial Corporation and GMAC Mortgage Corporation
Case Number: 4:2020cv00644
Filed: June 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Terry R Means
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 12:191
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 14, 2020 Filing 26 NOTICE of Consent to Notice of Removal filed by Bank of America, N.A. (Sutton, Heather)
August 14, 2020 Filing 25 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Bank of America, N.A.. (Sutton, Heather)
August 14, 2020 Filing 24 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Heather Sutton on behalf of Bank of America, N.A.. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Sutton, Heather)
August 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER DENYING MOTIONS FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT AND GRANTING MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT: Pending before the Court is Plaintiff's "Motion for Entry of Default; and for Default Judgment And Hearing Request" (doc. #9 ) and Plaintiff's Supplemental "Motion for Entry of Default; and for Default Judgment" (doc. #12 ). After review of these motions and the responses thereto, the Court concludes that they should be and they are hereby DENIED. Also pending before the Court is Plaintiff's Motion for an Extension of Time to File Amended Complaint (doc. #11 ). After review of the motion, the Court concludes that it should be and hereby is GRANTED. Plaintiff shall have until thirty days after the Court rules on her Motion to Remand (doc. #5 ) to file the Amended Complaint required by this Court's June 24, 2020 order. (Ordered by Senior Judge Terry R Means on 8/11/2020) (pef)
August 11, 2020 Filing 22 RESPONSE filed by JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A. re: #12 Supplemental Combined Request for Clerks Entry of Default and MOTION for Default Judgment against All Defendants, #9 First Combined Request for Clerks Entry of Default and MOTION for Default Judgment against All PartiesFirst MOTION for Hearing is requested, #19 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Lewis, Wm)
August 7, 2020 Filing 21 RESPONSE AND OBJECTION filed by Jackie Gaff re: #19 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Gaff, Jackie)
August 4, 2020 Filing 20 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Ally Financial, Inc. re #19 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Flynn, Virginia)
August 4, 2020 Filing 19 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Ally Financial, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Flynn, Virginia)
August 4, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Virginia Bell Flynn on behalf of Ally Financial, Inc.. (Filer will update contact info in ECF.) (Flynn, Virginia)
July 29, 2020 Filing 17 ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to #9 Motion for Default Judgment,, Motion for Hearing, by Plaintiff Jackie Gaff. (Gaff, Jackie)
July 24, 2020 Filing 16 RESPONSE filed by Ronald Happe, Tyler Happe, Karissa Happe Jones, MSNI Advantage, LP, Main Street Asset Solutions, Inc., Main Street Associates, Inc. re: #9 First Combined Request for Clerks Entry of Default and MOTION for Default Judgment against All PartiesFirst MOTION for Hearing is requested (Ferguson, Chris)
July 23, 2020 Filing 15 RESPONSE filed by Ronald Happe, Tyler Happe, Karissa Happe Jones, MSNI Advantage, LP, Main Street Asset Solutions, Inc., Main Street Associates, Inc. re: #5 MOTION to Remand (Ferguson, Chris)
July 23, 2020 Filing 14 RESPONSE AND OBJECTION filed by Jackie Gaff re: #10 Response/Objection, (Gaff, Jackie)
July 21, 2020 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Ronald Happe, Tyler Happe, Karissa Happe Jones, MSNI Advantage, LP, Main Street Asset Solutions, Inc., Main Street Associates, Inc.. (Ferguson, Chris)
July 17, 2020 Filing 12 Supplemental Combined Request for Clerks Entry of Default and MOTION for Default Judgment against All Defendants filed by Jackie Gaff (Gaff, Jackie)
July 16, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Amended Complaint filed by Jackie Gaff (Gaff, Jackie)
July 16, 2020 Filing 10 RESPONSE filed by Ocwen Financial Corporation, Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, PHH Corporation, PHH Mortgage Corporation, U.S. Bank National Association re: #9 First Combined Request for Clerks Entry of Default and MOTION for Default Judgment against All PartiesFirst MOTION for Hearing is requested (Nunnallee, Adam)
July 16, 2020 Filing 9 First Combined Request for Clerks Entry of Default and MOTION for Default Judgment against All Parties (), First MOTION for Hearing is requested filed by Jackie Gaff with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Exhibits A-E) (Gaff, Jackie)
July 13, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Consent to Notice of Removal filed by Ocwen Financial Corporation, Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, PHH Corporation, PHH Mortgage Corporation, U.S. Bank National Association (Tavallaee, Meredith)
July 13, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Meredith Schaila Tavallaee on behalf of Ocwen Financial Corporation, Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, PHH Corporation, PHH Mortgage Corporation, U.S. Bank National Association. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Tavallaee, Meredith)
July 13, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Adam Ross Nunnallee on behalf of Ocwen Financial Corporation, Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, PHH Corporation, PHH Mortgage Corporation, U.S. Bank National Association. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Nunnallee, Adam)
July 13, 2020 Filing 5 Request for Remand filed by Jackie Gaff re: #1 Notice of Removal, (Gaff, Jackie) Modified event and docket text on 7/14/2020 (pef).
June 24, 2020 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:4. Wed Jun 24 15:11:17 CDT 2020 (crt)
June 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REQUIRING AMENDED COMPLAINT: Having now considered the notice of removal and the state-court papers attached to them, the Court concludes that Plaintiff should file an amended complaint. Plaintiff's amended complaint must be electronically filed with the clerk of the Court no later than July 24, 2020. Failure to timely comply with this order will result in appropriate sanctions, which may include the dismissal of Plaintiff's claims. (Ordered by Senior Judge Terry R Means on 6/24/2020) (pef)
June 22, 2020 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:2, 3. Mon Jun 22 10:15:24 CDT 2020 (crt)
June 20, 2020 Filing 3 Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party. (pef)
June 20, 2020 Filing 2 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. No prior sanctions found. (For court use only - links to the #national and #circuit indexes.) File to: Judge Means. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (pef)
June 20, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH JURY DEMAND filed by MSNI Advantage, LP. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0539-10932499) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) List of All Parties, #2 Exhibit(s) Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit(s) Supplemental Cover Sheet, #4 Exhibit(s) Notice of Removal, #5 Exhibit(s) Index of State Court Docs, #6 Declaration(s) Tarrant CAD Report) (Ferguson, Chris)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gaff v. MSNI Advantage, LP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jackie Gaff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jackie Goff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karissa Happe Jones
Represented By: Chris Ferguson
Represented By: Travis H Gray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Krissie
Represented By: Chris Ferguson
Represented By: Travis H Gray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Main Street Asset Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Chris Ferguson
Represented By: Travis H Gray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MSNI Advantage, LP
Represented By: Chris Ferguson
Represented By: Travis H Gray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC
Represented By: Adam Ross Nunnallee
Represented By: Meredith Sohaila Tavallaee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Residential Funding Corporation, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Marcie L Schout
Represented By: Wm Lance Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PHH Corporation
Represented By: Adam Ross Nunnallee
Represented By: Meredith Sohaila Tavallaee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sebring Capital Partners, LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald Happe
Represented By: Chris Ferguson
Represented By: Travis H Gray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyler Happe
Represented By: Chris Ferguson
Represented By: Travis H Gray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GMAC Residential Capital Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GMAC Mortgage, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ally Financial, Inc.
Represented By: Virginia Bell Flynn
Represented By: John Curtis Lynch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Homecomings Financial, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PHH Mortgage Corporation
Represented By: Adam Ross Nunnallee
Represented By: Meredith Sohaila Tavallaee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nealmikelance Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Main Street Associates, Inc.
Represented By: Chris Ferguson
Represented By: Travis H Gray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Residential Capital, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GMAC Residential Funding Corporation, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank National Association
Represented By: Adam Ross Nunnallee
Represented By: Meredith Sohaila Tavallaee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America, N.A.
Represented By: Heather Sutton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ocwen Financial Corporation
Represented By: Adam Ross Nunnallee
Represented By: Meredith Sohaila Tavallaee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GMAC Mortgage Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?