Thurman Development, LLC v. Union Pacific Railroad Company
Plaintiff: Thurman Development, LLC
Defendant: Union Pacific Railroad Company
Case Number: 4:2020cv00741
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Reed C O'Connor
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2020 Filing 12 RESPONSE filed by Union Pacific Railroad Company re: #6 First MOTION to Remand (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Sands, Afton)
September 3, 2020 Filing 11 Supplemental Appendix in Support filed by Thurman Development, LLC re #6 First MOTION to Remand (Stephens, Kerwin)
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING ORDER: Joinder of Parties due by 10/19/2020. Amended Pleadings due by 10/19/2020. Motions due by 7/12/2021. Deadline for mediation is on or before 5/12/2021. Discovery due by 6/11/2021. Pretrial Order due by 10/14/2021. Bench Trial set for 11/8/2021 before Judge Reed C. O'Connor. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 8/20/2020) (wrb)
August 20, 2020 Filing 9 Proposal for contents of scheduling and discovery order by Thurman Development, LLC. (Stephens, Kerwin)
August 14, 2020 Filing 8 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Thurman Development, LLC re #6 First MOTION to Remand (Stephens, Kerwin)
August 14, 2020 Filing 7 Appendix in Support filed by Thurman Development, LLC re #6 First MOTION to Remand (Stephens, Kerwin)
August 14, 2020 Filing 6 First MOTION to Remand filed by Thurman Development, LLC (Stephens, Kerwin)
July 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REQUIRING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND REPORT FOR CONTENTS OF SCHEDULING ORDER...Lead counsel for each party (or a designee attorney with appropriate authority) and any unrepresented party (except for a prisoner litigant proceeding pro se) shall confer (the Scheduling Conference) as soon as practicable, but in any event no later than August 5, 2020... Joint Report due by 8/19/2020. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 7/22/2020) (wrb)
July 21, 2020 Filing 4 ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to #1 Notice of Removal,,,, by Defendant Union Pacific Railroad Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A) (Sands, Afton)
July 20, 2020 Filing 3 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. File to: Judge O Connor. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. Attorneys are further reminded that, if necessary, they must comply with Local Rule 83.10(a) within 14 days or risk the possible dismissal of this case without prejudice or without further notice. (wrb)
July 17, 2020 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Union Pacific Railroad Company. (Sands, Afton)
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Union Pacific Railroad Company. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0539-11005866) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Index, #2 Exhibit(s) A, #3 Exhibit(s) B, #4 Exhibit(s) C, #5 Cover Sheet, #6 Cover Sheet Supplement) (Sands, Afton)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thurman Development, LLC v. Union Pacific Railroad Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thurman Development, LLC
Represented By: Kerwin B Stephens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Pacific Railroad Company
Represented By: Afton Dee Sands
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?