Gibson v. Police of Riverworth, Texas et al
Plaintiff: Debbie Gibson and Anne Marie Kirby
Defendant: Riverworth Police Department and Police of Riverworth, Texas
Case Number: 4:2020cv00921
Filed: August 12, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Reed C O'Connor
Referring Judge: Hal R Ray
Nature of Suit: Torts/Pers Prop: Other Personal Property Damage
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 2, 2020 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:11,12. Fri Oct 2 08:35:47 CDT 2020 (crt)
October 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 FINAL JUDGMENT: This Judgment is issued pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 58(a). This action came on for consideration by the Court, and the issues having been duly considered and a decision duly rendered, It is ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that this case is DISMISSED without prejudice. The taxable costs of court, as calculated by the clerk of court, shall be borne by the party incurring the same. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 10/2/2020) (tln)
October 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER ACCEPTING FINDINGS, CONCLUSIONS, AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE: The United States Magistrate Judge made Findings, Conclusions, and a Recommendation in this case. No objections were filed, and the Magistrate Judge's Recommendation is ripe for review. The Court has reviewed the proposed Findings, Conclusions, and Recommendation for plain error. Finding none, the Court believes that the Findings and Conclusions of the Magistrate Judge are correct, and they are accepted as the Findings and Conclusions of the Court. Accordingly, it is ORDERED that the Plaintiff's Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs (ECF No. #3 ) is DENIED, and this case is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 10/2/2020) (tln)
September 17, 2020 Filing 10 Mail returned as undeliverable. #7 Order And Notice of Deficiency, #6 Order, received back from Debbie Gibson as Unable to forward. No address update from last filed document. The current document has not been re-mailed. (wrb)
September 17, 2020 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:9. Thu Sep 17 13:58:12 CDT 2020 (crt)
September 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 FINDINGS, CONCLUSIONS, AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE: After considering the pleadings and the applicable legal authorities, the undersigned RECOMMENDS that United States District Judge Reed O'Connor DENY Plaintiff leave to proceed in forma pauperis and DISMISS the case WITHOUT PREJUDICE pursuant to Rule 41(b) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Hal R. Ray, Jr on 9/17/2020) (skg)
August 31, 2020 Filing 8 Mail returned as undeliverable re #4 New Case Notes, #5 Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party received back from Anne Marie Kirby as Return to Sender; Vacant; Unable to Forward. No address update from last filed document. The current document has not been re-mailed. (tln)
August 14, 2020 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:6, 7. Fri Aug 14 15:48:01 CDT 2020 (crt)
August 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Notice of Deficiency and Order: Debbie Gibson must address the following deficiency: It is therefore ORDERED that on or before September 14, 2020, Plaintiff shall either pay the full filing fee of $400 or file an amended motion to proceed in forma pauperis that includes a completed affidavit as required by 28 U.S.C 1915(a) and as provided in Form AO 239. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Hal R. Ray, Jr on 8/14/2020) (skg)
August 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: The Clerk of Court is directed to change the style of this case from "Anne M. Kirby v. Debbie Gibson" to "Debbie Gibson v. Police of Riverworth, Texas and Riverworth Police Department." (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Hal R. Ray, Jr on 8/14/2020) (skg)
August 13, 2020 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:4,5. cy to Kirby Thu Aug 13 14:08:13 CDT 2020 (crt)
August 13, 2020 Filing 5 Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party (wrb)
August 13, 2020 Filing 4 New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. CASREF case referral set (see Special Order 3). Magistrate Judge Ray preliminarily assigned. No prior sanctions found. (For court use only - links to the #national and #circuit indexes.) File to: No court file needed. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. Attorneys are further reminded that, if necessary, they must comply with Local Rule 83.10(a) within 14 days or risk the possible dismissal of this case without prejudice or without further notice. (wrb)
August 12, 2020 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS by Anne Marie Kirby. (wrb)
August 12, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Anne Marie Kirby (wrb)
August 12, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Anne Marie Kirby. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (wrb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gibson v. Police of Riverworth, Texas et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Riverworth Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Police of Riverworth, Texas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debbie Gibson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anne Marie Kirby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?