Moxie Pest Services - Dallas, LLC v. City of Mansfield, Texas
Plaintiff: Moxie Pest Services - Dallas, LLC
Defendant: City of Mansfield, Texas
Case Number: 4:2020cv00941
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Mark Pittman
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 FINAL JUDGMENT...This case dismissed without prejudice. (Ordered by Judge Mark Pittman on 9/10/2020) (wrb)
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 AGREED ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE...granting #23 ...this case dismissed w/o prejudice with each party to bear their own costs. (Ordered by Judge Mark Pittman on 9/10/2020) (wrb)
September 9, 2020 Filing 23 MOTION to Dismiss Without Prejudice filed by City of Mansfield, Texas (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Text Of Proposed Order)Attorney William W Krueger, III added to party City of Mansfield, Texas(pty:dft) (Krueger, William)
August 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER denying #6 Motion for TRO...it is ORDERED that the hearing tentatively scheduled for 9:00 a.m.on Monday, August 31, 2020, is hereby CANCELLED. (Ordered by Judge Mark Pittman on 8/28/2020) (wrb)
August 28, 2020 Filing 21 REPLY filed by Moxie Pest Services - Dallas, LLC re: #6 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (Krabill, Kent)
August 27, 2020 Filing 20 Appendix in Support filed by City of Mansfield, Texas re #19 Brief/Memorandum in Support of Motion, #18 Response/Objection to Plaintiff's Motion for TRO (Quast, Frederick)
August 27, 2020 Filing 19 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by City of Mansfield, Texas re #18 Response/Objection to Plaintiff's Motion for TRO (Quast, Frederick)
August 27, 2020 Filing 18 RESPONSE filed by City of Mansfield, Texas re: #6 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (Quast, Frederick)
August 25, 2020 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to City of Mansfield, Texas ; served on 8/25/2020. (Cowan, Clint)
August 25, 2020 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Moxie Pest Services - Dallas, LLC (Cowan, Clint)
August 25, 2020 Hearing Modification: Motion and Evidentiary Hearings terminated per DJ chambers. (bdb)
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER... It is hereby ORDERED that Defendant shall file a Response brief to Plaintiffs Motion for Temporary Restraining Order on or before August 27, 2020. Plaintiff may file a Reply to Defendants Response no later than 2:30 p.m. on August 28, 2020. Plaintiffs Reply may not contain any new evidence. It is further ORDERED that if the Court concludes that an evidentiary hearing on Plaintiffs Motion for Temporary Restraining Order is necessary, it will be held at 9:00 a.m. on Monday, August 31, 2020, in the Fourth Floor Courtroom of the Eldon B. Mahon United States Courthouse, located at 501 W. 10th Street, Fort Worth, Texas. The Court will notify the parties after reviewing all of the submissions whether the hearing will be held. (Ordered by Judge Mark Pittman on 8/25/2020) (wxc)
August 24, 2020 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Moxie Pest Services - Dallas, LLC re #7 Order Setting Deadline/Hearing,, (Cowan, Clint)
August 24, 2020 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to City of Mansfield, Texas ; served on 8/24/2020. (Cowan, Clint)
August 24, 2020 Filing 12 RESPONSE filed by Moxie Pest Services - Dallas, LLC re: #11 Order to Show Cause/Order to Answer, (Cowan, Clint)
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Order to Show Cause. Plaintiff is hereby ORDERED to show cause as to why they did not follow the instructions of the Court and serve Defendants counsel with a copy of the August 19, 2020 Order or notify the Court about the service. The Court may impose sanctions and/or dismiss this action depending on the explanations proffered by the Plaintiff. Plaintiff shall file their response to this order by 4:00 pm on August 24, 2020. (Ordered by Judge Mark Pittman on 8/24/2020) (wrb)
August 21, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to City of Mansfield, Texas ; served on 8/20/2020. (Krabill, Kent)
August 19, 2020 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to City of Mansfield, Texas. (wrb)
August 19, 2020 Filing 8 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. File to: Judge Pittman. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. Attorneys are further reminded that, if necessary, they must comply with Local Rule 83.10(a) within 14 days or risk the possible dismissal of this case without prejudice or without further notice. (wrb)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that Defendant shall file a Response brief to Plaintiff's #6 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order on or before August 26, 2020. It is further ORDERED that Plaintiff may file a Reply to Defendant's Response, if any, no later than August 27, 2020. Plaintiffs' Reply shall not contain additional evidence. It is further ORDERED that, if the Court concludes that an evidentiary hearing on Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order is necessary, it will be held at 9:00 a.m. on Friday, August 28, 2020. (Ordered by Judge Mark Pittman on 8/19/2020) (bdb)
August 19, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Moxie Pest Services - Dallas, LLC (Krabill, Kent)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Unfiling #4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Moxie Pest Services - Dallas, LLC due to the following deficiency: no cert of service, no cert of conf, deft has not designated counsel. re: #4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (Ordered by Judge Mark Pittman on 8/19/2020) (wrb)
August 19, 2020 Filing 4 [unfiled per #5 order of 8/19/20] MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Moxie Pest Services - Dallas, LLC (Krabill, Kent) Modified on 8/19/2020 (wrb).
August 19, 2020 Filing 3 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Moxie Pest Services - Dallas, LLC re #4 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. (Krabill, Kent) Modified on 8/19/2020 (npk).
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Moxie Pest Services - Dallas, LLC identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Walton Holdings GP, LLC; Headrick Holdings, LLC for Moxie Pest Services - Dallas, LLC. (Krabill, Kent)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against City of Mansfield, Texas filed by Moxie Pest Services - Dallas, LLC. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-11092664) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) C, #4 Exhibit(s) D, #5 Cover Sheet) (Krabill, Kent)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moxie Pest Services - Dallas, LLC v. City of Mansfield, Texas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Moxie Pest Services - Dallas, LLC
Represented By: Natalie S Washington
Represented By: Clint Cowan
Represented By: Kent D Krabill
Represented By: Natalie Soas Washington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Mansfield, Texas
Represented By: William W Krueger, III
Represented By: Frederick Fritz Quast
Represented By: E Allen Taylor, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?