Irvin-Bey v. Department of Justice et al
Plaintiff: Jermaine Duane Irvin-Bey and Jermaine Duane Irvin
Defendant: Joshua Burgess, Nancy Pelosi, House of Representatives, Congress of the United States, John McBryde, Department of Justice, William Barr, Federal Bureau of Prisons and Donald J. Trump
Case Number: 4:2020cv00942
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Terry R Means
Referring Judge: Reed C O'Connor
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Pet/Other: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 13, 2020 Filing 15 Correspondence to the Clerk filed by Jermaine Duane Irvin-Bey. Courtesy copy of public docket sheet mailed to Plaintiff. (bdb)
September 21, 2020 Filing 14 Freedom of Information Act Request filed by Jermaine Duane Irvin-Bey (wrb)
September 21, 2020 Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT for Default Judgment by Jermaine Duane Irvin-Bey. (wrb)
September 21, 2020 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT of Interference and Obstruction of Justice by Jermaine Duane Irvin-Bey. (wrb)
September 9, 2020 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:11. cy to Irvin-Bey, Inmate Acct Ofc Wed Sep 9 14:27:34 CDT 2020 (crt)
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 FILING FEE ORDER in amount of $5.57 with a balance of $344.43 remaining to be paid in monthly installments. Clerk to mail this order to the attention of the Inmate Trust Fund Department at the facility where the inmate resides. cy to inmate, inmate accounting office. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 9/9/2020) (wrb)
September 8, 2020 Filing 10 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Jermaine Duane Irvin-Bey (wxc)
September 8, 2020 Filing 9 Public correspondence received from Jermaine Duane Irvin-Bey. (wxc)
August 24, 2020 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:7. cy to Irvin-Bey with forms Mon Aug 24 10:55:47 CDT 2020 (crt)
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order and Notice of Deficiency: Jermaine Duane Irvin-Bey must address the following deficiency: $400 filing fee not paid, No CTA submitted. Failure to comply with this order may lead to dismissal for failure to prosecute pursuant to FRCvP 41(b). Deadline to cure the deficiency is 30 days. Clerk mailed copy of IFP and CTA to plaintff; clerk added alias to Plaintiff's name. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 8/24/2020) (wrb)
August 24, 2020 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:6. cy to Irvin-Bey Mon Aug 24 08:29:30 CDT 2020 (crt)
August 23, 2020 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:4,5. cy to Irvin-Bey Sun Aug 23 21:04:46 CDT 2020 (crt)
August 21, 2020 Filing 6 Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party (wrb)
August 21, 2020 Filing 5 New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. No prior sanctions found. (For court use only - links to the #national and #circuit indexes.) File to: No court file needed. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. Attorneys are further reminded that, if necessary, they must comply with Local Rule 83.10(a) within 14 days or risk the possible dismissal of this case without prejudice or without further notice. (wrb)
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. The judge, having taken senior status, desires to have this case reassigned to an active-status judge. The Clerk is directed to reassign this case by random draw to another judgment. Case reassigned to Judge Reed C. O'Connor for all further proceedings. Senior Judge Terry R Means no longer assigned to case. (Ordered by Senior Judge Terry R Means on 8/21/2020) (wrb)
August 19, 2020 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:2,3. cy to Irvin Wed Aug 19 22:29:22 CDT 2020 (crt)
August 19, 2020 Filing 3 Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party (wrb)
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. No prior sanctions found. (For court use only - links to the #national and #circuit indexes.) File to: staff attorney DK. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (wrb)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Jermaine Duane Irvin-Bey. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (wrb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Irvin-Bey v. Department of Justice et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jermaine Duane Irvin-Bey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jermaine Duane Irvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joshua Burgess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy Pelosi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: House of Representatives
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Congress of the United States
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John McBryde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Justice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Barr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Bureau of Prisons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald J. Trump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?