McBryde v. Akin et al
Plaintiff: Edward Charles McBryde
Defendant: Rick Denney, Wise County Jail, K. Sartor and Lane Akin
Case Number: 4:2020cv00943
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: John McBryde
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Pet/Other: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2020 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:9, 10. Fri Sep 4 09:09:36 CDT 2020 (crt)
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 FINAL JUDGMENT: In accordance with the court's order signed this date, the court ORDERS, ADJUDGES, and DECREES that the claims of plaintiff, Edward Charles McBryde, against defendants Sheriff Lane Akin, K. Sartor, and Rick Denney, be, and are hereby, dismissed. (Ordered by Senior Judge John McBryde on 9/3/2020) (pef)
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: On September 2, 2020, plaintiff filed his amended complaint. In it, plaintiff no longer asserts claims against Sheriff Lane Akin; accordingly, the court considers that any such claims have been abandoned and that Sheriff Akin is no longer a party to this action. Pursuant to the authority of 28 U.S.C. 1915A(b), the court ORDERS that plaintiff's claims in this action be, and are hereby, dismissed. (Ordered by Senior Judge John McBryde on 9/3/2020) (pef)
September 2, 2020 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Rick Denney, K. Sartor filed by Edward Charles McBryde. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (pef)
August 24, 2020 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:6. Mon Aug 24 11:12:25 CDT 2020 (crt)
August 24, 2020 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:6. Mon Aug 24 08:17:20 CDT 2020 (crt)
August 24, 2020 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:7. Mon Aug 24 08:15:02 CDT 2020 (crt)
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER RE: INITIAL PARTIAL FILING FEE AND COLLECTION AND PAYMENT OF FULL FILING FEE: It is therefore ORDERED that: Plaintiff is granted leave to proceed pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915. Plaintiff will not be assessed an initial partial filing fee because he lacks the requisite funds in his prison account to pay an initial fee; however, plaintiff will be required to pay the full filing fee of $350.00 pursuant to the PLRA. Clerk to mail this order to the attention of the Inmate Trust Fund Department at the facility where the inmate resides. (A copy of this order has been mailed to the attention of the inmate accounting office at Wise County Jail) (Ordered by Senior Judge John McBryde on 8/21/2020) (pef)
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 The court ORDERS that, by 4:00 p.m. on September 10, 2020, plaintiff file an amended complaint stating with particularity all the material facts on which he contends he will establish his right to recover against each defendant. (Ordered by Senior Judge John McBryde on 8/21/2020) (bcr)
August 19, 2020 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:3, 4, 5. Wed Aug 19 13:51:00 CDT 2020 (crt)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Standing ORDER Concerning Paper Filing in Cases Assigned to District Judge John McBryde...see order for specifics. Partial Suspension of Standing Order of 1/15/19 - The directive in paragraph 1 requiring that no document be filed by electronic means, and the directive in paragraph 2 requiring that paper copies of electronically filed documents be delivered to the clerk for filing, are suspended until 8/30/2020. (Ordered by Senior Judge John McBryde on 8/19/2020) (Attachments: #1 Continuation of Partial Suspension Order) (pef)
August 19, 2020 Filing 4 Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party. (pef)
August 19, 2020 Filing 3 New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. No prior sanctions found. (For court use only - links to the #national and #circuit indexes.) File to staff attorney DK. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (pef)
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis with certificate of trust account filed by Edward Charles McBryde. (pef)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Lane Akin, Rick Denney, K. Sartor, Wise County Jail filed by Edward Charles McBryde. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (pef)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McBryde v. Akin et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Charles McBryde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rick Denney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wise County Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K. Sartor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lane Akin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?