1010 East Avenue J LLC v. Union Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: 1010 East Avenue J LLC
Defendant: Berkley Southeast Insurance Group and Union Insurance Company
Case Number: 4:2020cv00958
Filed: August 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Reed C O'Connor
Nature of Suit: Contract: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING ORDER: Joinder of Parties due by 11/23/2020. Amended Pleadings due by 11/23/2020. Motions due by 3/29/2021. Deadline for mediation is on or before 1/27/2021. Discovery due by 2/26/2021. Pretrial Order due by 7/1/2021. Jury Trial set for 7/26/2021 before Judge Reed C. O'Connor. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 9/23/2020) (wxc)
September 22, 2020 Filing 9 Joint STATUS REPORT filed by 1010 East Avenue J LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s)) (Wieser, Jay)
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ELECTRONIC ORDER finding as moot #5 Motion to Dismiss. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 9/22/2020) (chmb)
September 21, 2020 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against All Defendants filed by 1010 East Avenue J LLC. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Brown, Lindsey)
August 31, 2020 Filing 6 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Union Insurance Company re #5 MOTION to Dismiss (Martin, Jennifer)
August 31, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Union Insurance Company (Martin, Jennifer)
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REQUIRING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND REPORT FOR CONTENTS OF SCHEDULING ORDER... The Joint Report, which shall be filed on or before September 22, 2020. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 8/25/2020) (wxc)
August 24, 2020 Filing 3 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. File to: Judge O Connor. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. Attorneys are further reminded that, if necessary, they must comply with Local Rule 83.10(a) within 14 days or risk the possible dismissal of this case without prejudice or without further notice. (wxc)
August 24, 2020 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Union Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate W.R. Berkley Corporation for Union Insurance Company. (Martin, Jennifer)
August 24, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH JURY DEMAND filed by Union Insurance Company. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0539-11108981) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Additional Page(s) Attachment 1, #2 Additional Page(s) Attachment 2, #3 Additional Page(s) Attachment 3, #4 Additional Page(s) Attachment 4, #5 Additional Page(s) Attachment 5, #6 Additional Page(s) Attachment 6, #7 Additional Page(s) Attachment 7, #8 Additional Page(s) 8, #9 Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #10 Cover Sheet Supplement Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet) (Martin, Jennifer)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: 1010 East Avenue J LLC v. Union Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Berkley Southeast Insurance Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Insurance Company
Represented By: Jennifer Gossom Martin
Represented By: Timothy P Delabar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 1010 East Avenue J LLC
Represented By: Lindsey Marsh Brown
Represented By: Jay K Wieser
Represented By: Allison Allman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?