Cheek v. United States
Plaintiff: John Cheek and John Ray Cheek
Defendant: United States, FNU Williams, FNU Anderson, FNU Seigova, Officer FNU McClendon, FNU Saladana, FNU Rameriz, FNU Bayer, FNU Ewing, FNU Carpenter, Dr. FNU Cayhill, FNU Guiterriz, Legal Assistant of Warden Mr. Morris, FNU Moreland, Lt. FNU Stegall, FNU DeSanto and FNU McCouflin
Case Number: 4:2020cv00991
Filed: September 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: John McBryde
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Pet/Other: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 5, 2020 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:15,16. Mon Oct 5 13:18:06 CDT 2020 (crt)
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 FINAL JUDGMENT: Consistent with the order signed this date, the court ORDERS, ADJUDGES, and DECREES that all claims of plaintiff, John Cheek, asserted in this action be, and are hereby, dismissed pursuant to the authority of 28 U.S.C. 1915A(b). (Ordered by Senior Judge John McBryde on 10/5/2020) (tln)
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER: The court ORDERS that plaintiff's claims be, and are hereby, dismissed pursuant to the authority of 28 U.S.C. 1915A(b). (Ordered by Senior Judge John McBryde on 10/5/2020) (tln)
October 2, 2020 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:14. Fri Oct 2 15:47:10 CDT 2020 (crt)
October 2, 2020 Filing 14 AMENDED COMPLAINT against United States, FNU McClendon, FNU Williams, FNU Ewing, FNU Saladana, FNU Guiterriz, FNU Moreland, Legal Assistant of Warden Mr. Morris, FNU Cayhill, FNU Bayer, FNU Anderson, FNU Seigova, FNU McCouflin, FNU Carpenter, FNU Rameriz, FNU DeSanto, FNU Stegall filed by John Cheek. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (bdb)
September 24, 2020 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:13. cy to Cheek Thu Sep 24 15:39:45 CDT 2020 (crt)
September 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: Amended Complaint due by 10/9/2020. re: #1 Complaint...Plaintiff to identify the defendant(s) he intends to sue and stating with specificity each of the facts he contends will establish his right to recover against each such defendant. (Ordered by Senior Judge John McBryde on 9/24/2020) (wrb)
September 24, 2020 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:12. cy to Cheek, BOP inmate accounting office Thu Sep 24 15:17:34 CDT 2020 (crt)
September 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Order For Partial Filing Fee in amount of $28.20 with a balance of $321.80 remaining to be paid in monthly installments. Clerk to mail this order to the attention of the Inmate Trust Fund Department at the facility where the inmate resides. (Ordered by Senior Judge John McBryde on 9/24/2020) (wrb)
September 21, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis with certificate of trust account filed by John Cheek. (bdb)
September 11, 2020 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:9. cy to Cheek with forms Fri Sep 11 09:56:31 CDT 2020 (crt)
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Order and Notice of Deficiency: John Cheek must address the following deficiency: Filing fee not paid nor has a request to proceed IFP been submitted. Failure to comply with this order may lead to dismissal for failure to prosecute pursuant to FRCvP 41(b). Deadline to cure the deficiency is 30 days. Copy of order mailed to Cheek with IFP and CTA form 9/11/20 (Ordered by Senior Judge John McBryde on 9/10/2020) (wrb)
September 10, 2020 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:8. cy to Cheek Thu Sep 10 08:31:18 CDT 2020 (crt)
September 10, 2020 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:7. cy to Cheek Thu Sep 10 08:23:45 CDT 2020 (crt)
September 10, 2020 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:6. cy to Cheek Thu Sep 10 08:20:18 CDT 2020 (crt)
September 10, 2020 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:5. cy to Cheek Thu Sep 10 08:19:25 CDT 2020 (crt)
September 10, 2020 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:4. cy to Cheek Thu Sep 10 08:17:25 CDT 2020 (crt)
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Partial Suspension Order 1. The directive in paragraph 1 of the undersigned's standing order signed January 15, 2019, requiring that no document be filed by electronic means be, and is hereby, suspended until November 30, 2020. And, 2. The directive of paragraph 2 of the undersigned's standing order that paper copies of electronically-filed documents be delivered to the clerk for filing be, and is hereby, suspended until November 30, 2020; provided, however,- 'that paper copies of any appendix over ten pages in length mustbe delivered to Chambers within three business days of their electronic filing (Ordered by Senior Judge John McBryde on 9/9/2020) (wrb)
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Standing ORDER Concerning Paper Filing in Cases Assigned to District Judge John McBryde...see order for specifics. (Ordered by Senior Judge John McBryde on 9/9/2020) (wrb)
September 9, 2020 Filing 6 Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party (wrb)
September 9, 2020 Filing 5 New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. No prior sanctions found. (For court use only - links to the #national and #circuit indexes.) File to staff attorney DK. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (wrb)
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Senior Judge John McBryde for all further proceedings. Senior Judge Terry R Means no longer assigned to case. (Ordered by Senior Judge Terry R Means on 9/9/2020) (wrb)
September 8, 2020 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:2,3. Tue Sep 8 12:46:49 CDT 2020 (crt)
September 8, 2020 Filing 3 Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party. (tln)
September 3, 2020 Filing 2 New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. (For court use only - links to the #national index and to the prior sanctions found within the #circuit index.) File to: staff attorney DK. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (tln)
September 3, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against United States filed by John Cheek. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (tln)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cheek v. United States
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Cheek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Ray Cheek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU Seigova
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer FNU McClendon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU Saladana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU Rameriz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU Bayer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU Ewing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU Carpenter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. FNU Cayhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU Guiterriz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Legal Assistant of Warden Mr. Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU Moreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lt. FNU Stegall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU DeSanto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU McCouflin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?