Roach v. BNSF Railway Company
Plaintiff: Ronnie M. Roach
Defendant: BNSF Railway Company and Burlington Northern and Santa Fe
Case Number: 4:2020cv01112
Filed: October 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Reed C O'Connor
Nature of Suit: Torts/Pers Inj: Federal Employers' Liability
Cause of Action: 45:51
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 2, 2020 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by BNSF Railway Company 's First Request for Admissions and Second Request for Production (Rodriguez, Justin)
November 24, 2020 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by BNSF Railway Company 's Rule 26(a) Initial Disclosures to Plaintiff Roach (Rodriguez, Justin)
November 23, 2020 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by BNSF Railway Company First Set of Interrogatories to Plaintiff Ronnie Roach and BNSF's First Request for Production to Plaintiff Ronnie Roach (Rodriguez, Justin)
November 23, 2020 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by BNSF Railway Company identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Burlington Northern Santa Fe, LLC, fka Burlington Northern Santa Fe Corporation aka Burlington Northern Santa Fe Railway aka BNSF for BNSF Railway Company. (Rodriguez, Justin)
November 23, 2020 Filing 12 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by BNSF Railway Company. (Rodriguez, Justin)
November 23, 2020 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,, with Jury Demand filed by BNSF Railway Company. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Attorneys are further reminded that, if necessary, they must comply with Local Rule 83.10(a) within 14 days or risk the possible dismissal of this case without prejudice or without further notice. (Rodriguez, Justin)
November 23, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Justin D Rodriguez on behalf of BNSF Railway Company. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Rodriguez, Justin)
November 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING ORDER: Joinder of Parties due by 1/11/2021. Amended Pleadings due by 1/11/2021. Motions due by 7/19/2021. Deadline for mediation is on or before 5/19/2021. Discovery due by 6/18/2021. Pretrial Order due by 10/21/2021. This case is set for trial on this Courts four-week docket beginning November 15, 2021, before Judge Reed C. O'Connor. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 11/12/2020) (mmw)
November 12, 2020 Filing 8 Joint Submission on Discovery Matters Joint Status Report by BNSF Railway Company. (Rodriguez, Justin)
October 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REQUIRING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND REPORT FOR CONTENTS OF SCHEDULING ORDER: Lead counsel for each party and any unrepresented party shall confer as soon as practicable, but in any event no later than November 4, 2020. The Joint Report shall be filed on or before November 25, 2020. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 10/21/2020) (mmw)
October 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Before the Court is Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed Without Local Counsel (ECF No. #2 ). The Court finds that it should be GRANTED. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 10/21/2020) (mmw)
October 21, 2020 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed (Rodriguez, Justin)
October 8, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to BNSF Railway Company. (tln)
October 8, 2020 Filing 3 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. File to: Judge O Connor. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. Attorneys are further reminded that, if necessary, they must comply with Local Rule 83.10(a) within 14 days or risk the possible dismissal of this case without prejudice or without further notice. (tln)
October 8, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION Leave to Appear without Local Counsel re #1 Complaint, filed by Ronnie M. Roach (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Sassaman, Shawn)
October 8, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against BNSF Railway Company filed by Ronnie M. Roach. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-11247336) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (Sassaman, Shawn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roach v. BNSF Railway Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BNSF Railway Company
Represented By: Justin D Rodriguez
Represented By: Susan J Travis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Burlington Northern and Santa Fe
Represented By: Justin D Rodriguez
Represented By: Susan J Travis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronnie M. Roach
Represented By: Shawn Sassaman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?