Brown v. Director, TDCJ-CID
Petitioner: William Brown
Respondent: Director, TDCJ-CID
Case Number: 4:2020cv01156
Filed: October 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Reed C O'Connor
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Pet/Habeas Corpus: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 21, 2020 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:7,8 mailed with NEF of #6 notice of transfer. Wed Oct 21 16:08:58 CDT 2020 (crt)
October 20, 2020 Filing 8 Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party (npk)
October 20, 2020 Filing 7 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. No prior sanctions found. (For court use only - links to the #national and #circuit indexes.) File to: staff attorney PW. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. Attorneys are further reminded that, if necessary, they must comply with Local Rule 83.10(a) within 14 days or risk the possible dismissal of this case without prejudice or without further notice. (npk)
October 20, 2020 Filing 6 Case electronically transferred in from District of Texas Eastern; Case Number 9:20-cv-00194. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas should seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Copy of NEF to be sent US Mail to parties not electronically noticed.
October 5, 2020 Filing fee: $ 5.00, receipt number TXE600054323. (ksd ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/21/2020.]
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDERED that the Clerk will transfer this action to the Clerk of the United States District Court for the Northern District of Texas, Fort Worth Division. Signed by Magistrate Judge Keith F. Giblin on 9/28/2020. (bjc, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/21/2020.]
September 28, 2020 Filing 4 MEMORANDUM OPINION regarding transfer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Keith F. Giblin on 9/28/2020. (bjc, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/21/2020.]
September 17, 2020 Filing 3 Request for status of case by William Brown.(mailed docket sheet on 9/17/20) (ljw, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/21/2020.]
September 14, 2020 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Keith F. Giblin. (ljw, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/21/2020.]
September 14, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Stay and Abeyance by William Brown. (ljw, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/21/2020.]
September 14, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by William Brown.(ljw, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 10/21/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown v. Director, TDCJ-CID
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Director, TDCJ-CID
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: William Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?