Rodriguez v. Atlas Van Lines, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Erica Rodriguez
Defendant: Atlas Van Lines, Inc. and Paul Oscar Vadenais
Not Classified By Court: ADR Provider
Case Number: 4:2020cv01203
Filed: November 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Mark Pittman
Nature of Suit: Torts/Pers Inj: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING ORDER: This case is set for trial on this Court's four-week docket beginning February 28, 2022, before Judge Mark Pittman. Counsel and the parties shall be ready for trial on two days' notice at any time during this four-week period. Joinder of Parties due by 2/26/2021. Amended Pleadings due by 2/26/2021. Motions due by 11/1/2021. Deadline for mediation is on or before 9/1/2021. Discovery due by 10/1/2021. Pretrial Order due by 2/3/2022. Attorney Rickey J Brantley for ADR Provider added. (Ordered by Judge Mark Pittman on 12/29/2020) (pef)
December 23, 2020 Filing 11 Joint STATUS REPORT and Discovery Control Plan filed by Atlas Van Lines, Inc., Paul Oscar Vadenais. (Ledyard, John)
December 14, 2020 Filing 10 Summons Returned Executed as to Atlas Van Lines, Inc.; served on 11/23/2020. regarding Atlas Van Lines, Inc. (Jones Penepacker, Kimberly) Modified docket text and summons returned executed date on 12/16/2020 (pef).
December 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REQUIRING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND REPORT FOR CONTENTS OF SCHEDULING ORDER: The Joint Report shall be filed on or before January 5, 2021. (Ordered by Judge Mark Pittman on 12/11/2020) (pef)
December 11, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,, filed by Paul Oscar Vadenais. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Attorneys are further reminded that, if necessary, they must comply with Local Rule 83.10(a) within 14 days or risk the possible dismissal of this case without prejudice or without further notice.Attorney Thomas W Fee added to party Paul Oscar Vadenais(pty:dft) (Fee, Thomas)
December 11, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,, filed by Atlas Van Lines, Inc.. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Attorneys are further reminded that, if necessary, they must comply with Local Rule 83.10(a) within 14 days or risk the possible dismissal of this case without prejudice or without further notice.Attorney Thomas W Fee added to party Atlas Van Lines, Inc.(pty:dft) (Fee, Thomas)
December 4, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Returned Executed as to Paul Oscar Vadenais; served on 11/23/2020. regarding personal service of Defendant Paul Vadenais (Jones Penepacker, Kimberly) Modified docket text on 12/7/2020 (pef).
December 3, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Paul Oscar Vadenais; served on 11/24/2020 . (Jones Penepacker, Kimberly) Modified on 12/4/2020 (tln).
November 3, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Atlas Van Lines, Inc., Paul Oscar Vadenais. (pef)
November 2, 2020 Filing 3 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. File to: Judge Pittman. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. Attorneys are further reminded that, if necessary, they must comply with Local Rule 83.10(a) within 14 days or risk the possible dismissal of this case without prejudice or without further notice. (pef)
November 2, 2020 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Erica Rodriguez identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Atlas Van Lines, Inc. for Erica Rodriguez. (Jones Penepacker, Kimberly)
November 2, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against All Defendants filed by Erica Rodriguez. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-11322523) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Jones Penepacker, Kimberly)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rodriguez v. Atlas Van Lines, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Atlas Van Lines, Inc.
Represented By: John M Ledyard
Represented By: Thomas W Fee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Oscar Vadenais
Represented By: John M Ledyard
Represented By: Thomas W Fee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erica Rodriguez
Represented By: Kimberly Nicole Jones Penepacker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: ADR Provider
Represented By: Rickey J Brantley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?