Wright v. Tarrant County Judge et al
Plaintiff: Rondale R. Wright and Rondale Raynard Wright, Sr.
Defendant: District Attorney, Sheriff, Tarrant County Judge, Jail Deputy, Fort Worth PD, Tarrant County Crime Lab, Sharen Wilson, Fort Worth Police Chief, Bill Waybourn, County Commissioner, Judge Ruben Gonzalez, State of Texas, Fort Worth Police Department, NFN Myars, NFN Minter, John Schulmeister, NFN Nunn, NFN Woods, NFN Swan and Thomas P Wilder
Case Number: 4:2020cv01205
Filed: November 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Reed C O'Connor
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Pet/Other: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 14, 2020 Filing 14 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Rondale Raynard Wright, Sr. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (wxc)
December 7, 2020 Filing 13 Pro Se Motion to Address Major Issues of Conflict filed by Rondale Raynard Wright, Sr. (pef)
December 3, 2020 Filing 12 Pro Se Motion to Seek Aid for Access filed by Rondale Raynard Wright, Sr (wxc)
December 3, 2020 Filing 11 Pro Se Motion filed by Rondale Raynard Wright, Sr (wxc)
December 2, 2020 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:10. w/cert of inmate trust attached Wed Dec 2 09:24:51 CST 2020 (crt)
December 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER AND NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY: Rondale Raynard Wright, Sr must address the following deficiency: A certificate of inmate trust account for the six month period immediately before filing the complaint has not been submitted. Failure to comply with this order may lead to dismissal for failure to prosecute pursuant to FRCvP 41(b). Deadline to cure the deficiency is 30 days. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 12/1/2020) (bdb)
November 30, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis with certificate of trust account (not completed or certified) filed by Rondale Raynard Wright, Sr. (tln)
November 30, 2020 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Bill Waybourn, Thomas P Wilder, Sharen Wilson, Ruben Gonzalez, NFN Minter, John Schulmeister, NFN Swan, NFN Nunn, NFN Myars, NFN Woods, Fort Worth Police Department filed by Rondale Raynard Wright, Sr. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (tln)
November 30, 2020 Filing 7 Pro Se Motion for access in above case number to gain appointed attorney's counsil filed by Rondale R. Wright. (tln)
November 19, 2020 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:6. Thu Nov 19 14:05:41 CST 2020 (crt)
November 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR EXTENSION #5 ...It is therefore ORDERED that the Pro Se Motion for Conflicts of Interest Set in Above Case Number, construed as a motion for extension of time to comply with the Order of Severance (ECF No. #5 ), is GRANTED, such that plaintiff Wright shall have until December 21, 2020 to file the amended complaint and in forma pauperis application with a certificate of inmate trust account as previously ordered. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 11/19/2020) (wxc)
November 18, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Conflicts of Interest filed by Rondale R. Wright (npk)
November 3, 2020 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:2,3,4. 1983 and IFP mailed Tue Nov 3 15:39:03 CST 2020 (crt)
November 3, 2020 Filing 4 Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party (npk)
November 3, 2020 Filing 3 New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. File to: No court file needed. No prior sanctions found. (For court use only - links to the #national and #circuit indexes.) Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Cureton). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (npk)
November 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER OF SEVERANCE: The Motion to Suspend the Actions of the Courts, Criminal District Attorney and the Sheriffs Department of Tarrant County shall be SEVERED into a separate new civil action as to Plaintiff Rondale R. Wright, with a new cause number being assigned to that case. In the new civil action, the Clerk of Court shall also file a copy of this Order. Plaintiff Rondale Wright shall, within thirty (30) days from the date of this Order, file an Amended Complaint in the new civil suit setting forth his specific claims. Plaintiff Wright shall, within thirty (30) days from the date of this Order, pay the filing fee of $400.00 or file in the new civil case (a) a signed application to proceed in forma pauperis, and (b) a copy of his inmate trust account statement (or institutional equivalent) for the 6-month period immediately preceding the filing of his complaint, certified by one of the officers at the institution where Wright is incarcerated. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 11/3/2020) (npk)
November 2, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION to Suspend the actions of the courts, criminal district attorney and sheriff's department of Tarrant County filed by Rondale R. Wright (npk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wright v. Tarrant County Judge et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rondale R. Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rondale Raynard Wright, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: District Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheriff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tarrant County Judge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jail Deputy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fort Worth PD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tarrant County Crime Lab
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sharen Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fort Worth Police Chief
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bill Waybourn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judge Ruben Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Texas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fort Worth Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NFN Myars
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NFN Minter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Schulmeister
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NFN Nunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NFN Woods
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NFN Swan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas P Wilder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?