January 8, 2021 |
Filing 11
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #10 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Kelly E. Moynihan. Important Reminder: Unless excused for cause, an attorney who is not an ECF user must register within 14 days of the date the attorney appears in a case pursuant to LR 5.1(f) and LCrR 49.2(g). (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 1/8/2021) (chmb)(lcmhn)
|
January 7, 2021 |
Filing 10
Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney Kelly E. Moynihan (Filing fee $100; Receipt number 0539-11460186) filed by Ankura Trust Company LLC (Carew, Patrick) Docket text modified on 1/7/2021 (twd).
|
December 22, 2020 |
Filing 9
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #7 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of David M. Posner. Important Reminder: Unless excused for cause, an attorney who is not an ECF user must register within 14 days of the date the attorney appears in a case pursuant to LR 5.1(f) and LCrR 49.2(g). (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 12/22/2020) (chmb)(lcmhn)
|
December 22, 2020 |
Filing 8
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #6 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Todd C. Meyers. Important Reminder: Unless excused for cause, an attorney who is not an ECF user must register within 14 days of the date the attorney appears in a case pursuant to LR 5.1(f) and LCrR 49.2(g). (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 12/22/2020) (chmb)(lcmhn)
|
December 21, 2020 |
Filing 7
Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney David M. Posner (Filing fee $100; Receipt number 0539-11460264) filed by Ankura Trust Company LLC (Carew, Patrick)
|
December 21, 2020 |
Filing 6
Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney Todd C. Meyers (Filing fee $100; Receipt number 0539-11460138) filed by Ankura Trust Company LLC (Carew, Patrick)
|
December 18, 2020 |
Filing 5
CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by PlainsCapital Bank. (Green, Debbie)
|
December 18, 2020 |
Filing 4
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Debbie Elena Green on behalf of PlainsCapital Bank. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Green, Debbie)
|
December 18, 2020 |
Filing 3
Notice Transmitting BK Record on Appeal re #1 Notice Transmitting BK Appeal or Withdrawal of Reference,,,,,, (Attachments: #1 Mini Record, #2 Volume 2 - Appellant Record, #3 Volume 3, #4 Volume 4 - Appellee Record, #5 Volume 5, #6 Volume 6) (Rueter - BK, Karyn)
|
December 17, 2020 |
Filing 2
CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Ankura Trust Company LLC. (Carew, Patrick)
|
November 13, 2020 |
New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. File to: Judge O Connor. Attorneys are further reminded that, if necessary, they must comply with Local Rule 83.10(a) within 14 days or risk the possible dismissal of this case without prejudice or without further notice. (tln)
|
November 13, 2020 |
Filing 1
Pursuant to Fed. R. Bankr. P. 8003(d), the bankruptcy clerk has transmitted the notice of appeal filed in < number 20-42002 and the notice of appeal has now been docketed in the district court in case 4:20-cv-1240. (The filing fee has been paid in the Bankruptcy Court.) Pursuant to < 8009, before the record on appeal can be assembled and filed in the district court, designations of items to be included in the record on appeal and statements of issues must be filed in the bankruptcy case. If a sealed document is designated, the designating party must file a motion in the district court case for the document to be accepted under seal. See also < 8012.1. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: <. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Service List, #2 Coversheet, #3 Notice of appeal, #4 Appealed Order, #5 Docket Sheet) (Longoria - TXNB, Sheree)
|