Boyle v. Wilson et al
Plaintiff: Dennis Boyle
Defendant: S. Williams, Eric Wilson and B.P. Waller
Case Number: 4:2021cv00232
Filed: February 18, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Mark Pittman
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Pet/Other: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 26, 2021 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:2, 3, 4. Fri Feb 26 08:45:48 CST 2021 (crt)
February 25, 2021 Filing 4 Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party (mmw)
February 25, 2021 Filing 3 New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. No prior sanctions found. (For court use only - links to the #national and #circuit indexes.) File to: STFAM No court file needed. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. Attorneys are further reminded that, if necessary, they must comply with Local Rule 83.10(a) within 14 days or risk the possible dismissal of this case without prejudice or without further notice. (mmw)
February 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER OF SEVERANCE: The complaint of James Rudzavice shall continue under this Civil Action No. 4:21-CV-176-P. The complaints of each of the other 186 named Plaintiffs shall be SEVERED into separate actions as to each Plaintiff, with a new cause number being assigned to each Plaintiff. (See Order for specifics) (Ordered by Judge Mark Pittman on 2/25/2021) (bdb) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/26/2021: #1 Additional Page(s) Amended Complaint, #2 IFP) (mmw).
February 18, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against B.P. Waller, S. Williams, Eric Wilson filed by Donnie Waldo, Jr, Eric Nevue, Jamar Montral Richardson, Ignacio Salcido, Dylan Hedrick, Blake Robertson, Baron Jones, Erick Mayorga, Delvin Green, Daniel McCormick, Rafael Tovar, Jose A. Rodriguez, Robert Luong, Nicholas Hamm, Ruben Santoyo, James Johnson, Chris Brown, Chris Merriman, Michael Mendoza, Kenneth Wayne Mims, Jr, Derrick Holt, Donald Dobie, Noah Alonzo, Eliseo Arteaga, Davis Kirton, Kurtis Hawkins, Jeremiah Gant, Kingsley Otuya, Derrick Frazier, Jose Garcia, Leonel J. Villicana, Jose Paco Villegas, Damien Kimble, Joel Salcedo, Josue Coy, Daniel J. Sullivan, Luis Cervantes, Leslie Strong, Taylor Higginbothom, Justin Tatum, Larry Branch, Kenny Chipres, Jason Aman, Miguel Angel Carreon, Rudy R. Tajeda, Cedano Martinez Domingo, Miguel Angel Galvan, Jr, Deshun Keith Hall, Andrew Luten, Mike Porter, Kevin Hutchinson, Jose Mata Soto, Andrew Searcy, Joseph Kuykendoll, Jerry Malaer, Jean Loui Vargas-Malave, Charles Jackson, Yoo Heon J, Floyd Wagner, William Craig, Randy Sisneros, Andrew Dickson, Steven Hahnel, Dennis Boyle, Eric Staal, Andres Ramirez, Eugenio Perez, Ronelle Oudems, Jeremy Miller, Steven Hill, William Slattery, Eddy Bullcalf, Rick Mofa, Mark Palmer, Derrick White, Mitchel Miller, David Antwone Ricks, Joseph Hernandez, Christopher Moore, Richard J. Baxter, Mauro Gonzales, Christopher Flores, Odumeqwu Ingram, Daryl Pawlak, Eric Hardin, James Rudzavice, Kelien Deshawn Thompson, Andrew Guerro, Charles Scott, Bryson Coleman, Andrew Berko, Kevin Borges, Johnny Joe Juarez, McKay Stringham, Jerry Jackson, Victor Jones, Tommy Escobedo Guzman, Christopher Lambert, Randal Joseph Bookout, Henry David Jackson, Timothy Sims, Justin D. Regan, Samuel Condo, Guadulupe Mecedo, Kyree Barton, Enrique Gamino-Perez, Preston Bushard, Emanuel Cervantes, Gordon Bagneschi, Charles Johnson, Julian Cabrera, Anthony Johnson, Michael Shorter, Pedro Gil, III, Steve Tyler, James Rivers, Chad Hammond, Jamie Cortez, Ebube Otuonye, Eugene Durst Self, Justin Ray Holguin, Jonathan Lee, Morgan Baldwin, Roy Perkins, Michael Henderson, Derek C. Toledo, Roger Roybal, David Knowles, Danny Daugherty, Jose Rivera Nova, Dayton Williams, John Hitchcock, Rafal Arculeta, Jr, Blake Trevino, Tito Dominguez, Joe David Sandoval, Michael Jose Sanchez, Brian Chinn, Paulino Carranza, Hal Harkrader, Lydsey Cox, Efren Madrid Jr., Darien Reliford, Victor Alejandro Valero Loredo, Jeremy Matthews, Shaun Meyer, Hector Valdez, Jason Schepers, Perry Damen, Victor Bustamante, Luis Alberto Mendez, Tacorrius Jordan, Joseph Hinojosa, Mark Poirier, Edward D. Rodriguez, Billy Gentry, Donald Cata, Dwight Branch, Fernando Artiaga, Kurt Bryant, John R. Holt, Brian Morton, John Jose Barajas, Mcmaryion Jeffrey, Juan Bautista, Jarvis Moblin, Mike Meeks, Marcos Olvera, Jerry Sisco, Benny Graham, Juan Ramirez, Charles Layne, James Milfred, Daniel Miller, Winston Martin, Joshua Amos, Charles Davis, Andy Crook, Melvin Nowell, Jose Ramirez, Mark Yetter, Robert Young, Louis de la Torre, Leslie Williams, Jason Woerner, Dalton Woods, Pedro Zepeda. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 envelope) (npk) Modified on 2/24/2021 (bdb).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Boyle v. Wilson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis Boyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B.P. Waller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?