KY Home & Garden LLC v. Clear Lane Freight Systems LLC et al
Plaintiff: KY Home & Garden, LLC and KY Home & Garden LLC
Defendant: Clear Lane Freight Systems, LLC, Does 1-20, Freightquote.com, Inc., Estes Clear Lane, LLC, Wallace Kettler, Thomas Nagel, Ingi Torfason, Clear Lane Freight Systems LLC, Freightquote.com Inc and Estes Clear Lane LLC
Case Number: 4:2021cv00555
Filed: April 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Mark Pittman
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Commerce
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER REQUIRING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND REPORT FOR CONTENTS OF SCHEDULING ORDER: The Joint Report shall be filed on or before June 25, 2021. (Ordered by Judge Mark Pittman on 6/4/2021) (mmw)
June 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Plaintiff's First Supplemented COMPLAINT against Clear Lane Freight Systems, LLC, Does 1-20, Estes Clear Lane, LLC, Freightquote.com, Inc., Wallace Kettler, Thomas Nagel, and Ingi Torfason filed by KY Home & Garden, LLC. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) C, #4 Exhibit(s) D, #5 Exhibit(s) E, #6 Exhibit(s) F) (mmw)
June 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: Before the Court is Plaintiff's Motion to Supplement Original Complaint. ECF No. #12 . Having considered the Motion, docket entries, and applicable law, the Court finds that the Motion should be and is hereby GRANTED. Accordingly, the Clerk of this Court is INSTRUCTED to file Plaintiff's Proposed Supplement. ECF No. 12-3. (Ordered by Judge Mark Pittman on 6/4/2021) (mmw)
May 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Complaint filed by KY Home & Garden, LLC with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit(s) Proposed Supplement (redline copy), #3 Exhibit(s) Proposed Supplement (clean copy), #4 Exhibit(s) Proposed Supplement - Exhibit A, #5 Exhibit(s) Proposed Supplement - Exhibit B, #6 Exhibit(s) Proposed Supplement - Exhibit C, #7 Exhibit(s) Proposed Supplement - Exhibit D, #8 Exhibit(s) Proposed Supplement - Exhibit E, #9 Exhibit(s) Proposed Supplement - Exhibit F) (Leavitt, Brandon)
May 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE of Dismissal of Thomas Nagel, Wallace Kettler, Estes Clear Lane LLC, and Ingi Torfason filed by KY Home & Garden, LLC (Leavitt, Brandon)
May 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: Before the Court is Plaintiff's Opposition to the Clear Lane Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (ECF No. #8 ) and brief in support (ECF No. #9 ), filed May 14, 2021. The Court finds these filings inappropriate because there is no pending motion to dismiss that requires Plaintiff to file a response. Therefore, the Court finds that Plaintiff's response and brief in support are deficient and should be and are hereby STRICKEN. Accordingly, the Clerk of this Court is INSTRUCTED to UNFILE Plaintiff's response and brief in support. (Ordered by Judge Mark Pittman on 5/14/2021) (pef)
May 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ***STRICKEN AND UNFILED PER #10 ORDER*** Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by KY Home & Garden, LLC re #8 Response/Objection (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Leavitt, Brandon) Modified on 5/14/2021 (pef).
May 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ***STRICKEN AND UNFILED PER #10 ORDER*** RESPONSE AND OBJECTION filed by KY Home & Garden, LLC re: #6 Answer to Complaint,,, (Leavitt, Brandon) Modified on 5/14/2021 (pef).
May 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Freightquote.com, Inc.. Waiver sent on 5/12/2021. (Leavitt, Brandon)
May 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint filed by Clear Lane Freight Systems, LLC, Thomas Nagel, Wallace Kettler, Estes Clear Lane, LLC and Ingi Torfason. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Attorneys are further reminded that, if necessary, they must comply with Local Rule 83.10(a) within 14 days or risk the possible dismissal of this case without prejudice or without further notice.Attorney Lindsay G. Gorbach added to party Clear Lane Freight Systems, LLC(pty:dft) (Gorbach, Lindsay) Modified filers per PDF on 5/13/2021 (mmw).
April 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Does 1-20. (tln)
April 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Clear Lane Freight Systems, LLC, Estes Clear Lane, LLC, Freightquote.com, Inc., Wallace Kettler, Thomas Nagel, Ingi Torfason. (tln)
April 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. File to: Judge Pittman. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. Attorneys are further reminded that, if necessary, they must comply with Local Rule 83.10(a) within 14 days or risk the possible dismissal of this case without prejudice or without further notice. (tln)
April 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by KY Home & Garden, LLC. (Leavitt, Brandon)
April 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against All Defendants filed by KY Home & Garden, LLC. (Filing fee $402; Receipt number 0539-11807299) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit(s) A - Clear Lane entities, #3 Exhibit(s) B - Freightquote entities, #4 Exhibit(s) C - Agreement and Bill of Lading, #5 Exhibit(s) D - Correspondence, #6 Exhibit(s) E - Lost Freight Claim) (Leavitt, Brandon)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: KY Home & Garden LLC v. Clear Lane Freight Systems LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clear Lane Freight Systems, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-20
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Freightquote.com, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Estes Clear Lane, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wallace Kettler
Represented By: Lindsay G. Gorbach
Represented By: Gregory R Brenner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Nagel
Represented By: Lindsay G. Gorbach
Represented By: Gregory R Brenner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ingi Torfason
Represented By: Lindsay G. Gorbach
Represented By: Gregory R Brenner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clear Lane Freight Systems LLC
Represented By: Lindsay G. Gorbach
Represented By: Gregory R Brenner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Freightquote.com Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Estes Clear Lane LLC
Represented By: Lindsay G. Gorbach
Represented By: Gregory R Brenner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KY Home & Garden, LLC
Represented By: Brandon James Leavitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KY Home & Garden LLC
Represented By: Brandon James Leavitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?